EP3201337 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE OF NON-CODING RNA IN CELL CULTURING AND SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hocuslocus, LLC 170 Chestnut Street Albany, NY 12210 / US | For all designated states Universität für Bodenkultur Wien Muthgasse 18 1190 Vienna / AT | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVELETH, Edward 22 Valleyview Drive Albany, NY 12208 / US | 02 /
BORTH, Nicole Paradisgasse 36 A-1190 Vienna / AT | [2017/36] |
Former [2017/32] | 01 /
EVELETH, Edward 170 Chestnut Street Albany, NY 12210 / US | ||
02 /
BORTH, Nicole Paradisgasse 36 A-1190 Vienna / AT | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15847837.0 | 03.10.2015 | [2017/32] | WO2015US53897 | Priority number, date | US201462059573P | 03.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462059573 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016054616 | Date: | 07.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3201337 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N5/10, C12N15/85 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N5/10 (US);
C12N2310/141 (EP,US);
C12N2320/10 (EP,US);
C12N2330/51 (EP,US);
C12N2800/24 (EP,US);
C12N2840/102 (EP,US);
C12N2840/105 (EP,US);
C12N2999/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | 03.05.2017 | ME | 03.05.2017 | Validation states | MA | 03.05.2017 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON NICHTCODIERENDER RNA IN ZELLKULTIVIERUNG UND -AUSWAHL | [2017/32] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE OF NON-CODING RNA IN CELL CULTURING AND SELECTION | [2017/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISANT UN ARN NON CODANT EN VUE DE LA CULTURE ET DE LA SÉLECTION DE CELLULES | [2017/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/32] | 03.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008120733 (HAFNER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 8 * the whole document * [I] 1,2,4,9; | [A]WO2010091837 (QIAGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 25; figure 1b * * claim - ** the whole document *; | [X] - SHI-LUNG LIN ET AL., "Intronic MicroRNA (miRNA)", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICINE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, US, (20060101), vol. 335, no. 18, doi:10.1155/JBB/2006/26818, ISSN 1110-7243, pages 1350 - 13, XP055222271 [X] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/JBB/2006/26818 | International search | [XY]WO2013182553 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [X] 1-3, 15, 29 * ; abstract; page 4, lines 19-23; page 5, line 39 to page 6, line 5; page 6, lines 25-26; page 7, lines 6-8; page 14, lines 2-22; page 17, lines 13-20 * [Y] 16, 17/15, 17/16; | [X]US2005215497 (HAREL-BELLAN ANNICK [FR], et al) [X] 14 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0063], [0093]-[0095] *; | [Y] - DOYLE, F et al., "Trans-Regulation Of RNA-Binding Protein Motifs By MicroRNA.", Frontiers in Genetics, vol. 5, no. 79, (20140415), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://journal.frontiersin.org/article/10.3389/fgene.2014.00079/full, XP055424781 [Y] 16, 17/15, 17/16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fgene.2014.00079 |