EP3197004 - CHARGING METHOD AND RECHARGEABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Pinghua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Kangmin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15849367.6 | 23.04.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015CN77246 | Priority number, date | CN201410531094 | 10.10.2014 Original published format: CN201410531094 | [2017/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016054907 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3197004 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/04, H02J7/00, H01M10/44, H01M10/48 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
H02J7/0021 (CN);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/446 (CN);
H01M10/48 (EP,CN,US);
H01M10/488 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/0071 (EP,US);
H02J7/04 (EP);
H01M10/486 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2220/30 (US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/30] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Title | German: | LADEVERFAHREN UND AUFLADBARE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/30] | English: | CHARGING METHOD AND RECHARGEABLE DEVICE | [2017/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE ET DISPOSITIF RECHARGEABLE | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2017 | Translation filed | 18.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 18.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 17.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5600230 (DUNSTAN ROBERT A [US]) [I] 1-6,11-16 * column 14, line 41 - column 15, line 22; figure 12 *[A] 7-10,17-20; | [XAI]CN101409456 (SHENZHEN COSHIP ELECTRONICS CO [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,11,12,15 * page 6 - page 14; figures 1-3 * [A] 7-10,17-20 [I] 3,4,6,13,14,16; | [I]US2010045242 (NAGASHIMA OSAMU [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 6, paragraph 86 - page 9, paragraph 142; figures 3-10 *; | [XI]EP2466719 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 7-9,17-19 * page 2, paragraph 7 - page 3, paragraph 14 * * page 5, paragraph 33 - paragraph 36; figure 1 * * page 6, paragraph 42 - page 10, paragraph 75; figures 3-5 * * page 16, paragraph 131 * [I] 1-6,10-16,20; | [XI]EP2505418 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 7-9,17-19 * page 3, paragraph 18 - page 6, paragraph 41; figures 1-4 * * page 7, paragraph 48 - page 9, paragraph 74; figures 5-9 * [I] 1-6,10-16,20; | [I]WO2014104413 (RICOH CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * page 5, line 5 - page 41, line 21; figures 1-12 * | International search | [A]CN101170260 (WISTRON CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-22 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101902063 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC) [A] 1-22 * , the whole document *; | [Y]CN102738855 (SONY CORP) [Y] 8-10, 19-21 * , claims 1 and 5 *; | [A]CN102901926 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-22* , the whole document *; | [XY]CN103682498 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 7, 12-16, 18 * , description, paragraphs 297-312, and figures 2 and 8, description, paragraphs 297-312, and figures 2 and 8 * [Y] 8-10, 19-21; | [PX]CN104362684 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-22 * , claims 1-22 * |