EP3208313 - POLYIMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION, POLYIMIDE FILM AND LAMINATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMARU, Teruhisa c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboartory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Yuuki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboartory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 03 /
SUENAGA, Shuya c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboartory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 04 /
DAITO, Masayuki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboartory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 05 /
MUKASA, Kazuaki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Hiratsuka Research Laboratory 6-2 Higashiyawata 5-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15850775.6 | 15.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015JP79227 | Priority number, date | JP20140212893 | 17.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014212893 | [2017/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016060213 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208313 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3208313 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08L79/08, B32B27/34, C08G73/10, C08J5/18, C08J7/04, C08K3/36, B32B15/08, B32B17/06, B32B27/20, B32B27/28 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08L79/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B17/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/281 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/10 (EP,US);
C08G73/1039 (KR,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/04 (KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/536 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | C08L79/08, B32B27/34, C08G73/10, C08J5/18, C08J7/04, C08K3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYIMIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, POLYIMIDFILM UND LAMINAT | [2017/34] | English: | POLYIMIDE RESIN COMPOSITION, POLYIMIDE FILM AND LAMINATE | [2017/34] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYIMIDE, FILM DE POLYIMIDE ET STRATIFIÉ | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2017 | Translation filed | 13.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 13.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.10.2015 | AL | 30.01.2019 | AT | 30.01.2019 | CY | 30.01.2019 | CZ | 30.01.2019 | DK | 30.01.2019 | EE | 30.01.2019 | ES | 30.01.2019 | FI | 30.01.2019 | HR | 30.01.2019 | IT | 30.01.2019 | LT | 30.01.2019 | LV | 30.01.2019 | MC | 30.01.2019 | MK | 30.01.2019 | MT | 30.01.2019 | PL | 30.01.2019 | RO | 30.01.2019 | RS | 30.01.2019 | SE | 30.01.2019 | SI | 30.01.2019 | SK | 30.01.2019 | SM | 30.01.2019 | TR | 30.01.2019 | BG | 30.04.2019 | NO | 30.04.2019 | GR | 01.05.2019 | IS | 30.05.2019 | PT | 30.05.2019 | IE | 15.10.2019 | LU | 15.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 15.10.2015 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
MT | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.10.2015 | |
AL | 30.01.2019 | ||
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CY | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 15.10.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 15.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
MC | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
TR | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SI | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
AT | 30.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
SM | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 30.01.2019 | |
CZ | 30.01.2019 | ||
DK | 30.01.2019 | ||
EE | 30.01.2019 | ||
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RO | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
SK | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 30.01.2019 | |
ES | 30.01.2019 | ||
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
IT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
HR | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
LV | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
RS | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
IS | 30.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
BG | 30.04.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
GR | 01.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 30.01.2019 | |
FI | 30.01.2019 | ||
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
PL | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
SE | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 30.01.2019 | |
LT | 30.01.2019 | ||
NO | 30.04.2019 | ||
PT | 30.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008231327 (IHARA CHEMICAL IND CO) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0137]; example 2 *; | [A]JP2010180349 (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0110]; example 2 * * paragraph [0095] * | International search | [A]JP2002322274 (NEW JAPAN CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004109311 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005306940 (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006083209 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2009107429 (HITACHI CHEM DUPONT MICROSYS [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & JP 5392247 B & US 2011/0059305 A1 & EP 2248843 A1 & CN 101959935 B & KR 10-2010-0125252 A & TW 200946562 A & TW 201422681 A *; | [A]JP2011170321 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & CN 102127459 A & KR 10-2011-0085891 A & TW 201132703 A *; | [A]JP2013082774 (KANEKA CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014007544 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & JP 2015-504458 A & US 2014/0316074 A1 & KR 10-2014-0005103 A & CN 103930489 A & TW 201418327 *; | [A]WO2014051050 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & US 2015/0225523 A1 & EP 2902446 A1 & CN 104704057 A & KR 10-2015-0065681 A & TW 201422718 A *; | [PA]WO2015002273 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * , entire text & TW 201506061 A *; | [PA]WO2015122032 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-7* , entire text & TW 201531526 A *; | [PA]WO2015152178 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-7 * , entire text (Family: none) * |