EP3207220 - A STATOR MECHANISM, A TURBINE AND A METHOD FOR MAINTENANCE OF THE STATOR MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lappeenrannan Teknillinen Yliopisto Skinnarilankatu 34 53850 Lappeenranta / FI | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARJOLA, Jaakko Rauhalantie 20 FI-52700 Mäntyharju / FI | 02 /
GRÖNMAN, Aki Jousimiehenkatu 10 a as 4 FI-53850 Lappeenranta / FI | 03 /
SAARI, Esa Vilppulanpolku 16 B 25 FI-33720 Tampere / FI | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 15850886.1 | 16.10.2015 | [2017/34] | WO2015FI50704 | Priority number, date | FI20140005913 | 17.10.2014 Original published format: FI 20145913 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016059300 | Date: | 21.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3207220 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 21.04.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D17/16, F01D25/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
F01D17/16 (FI);
F01D17/162 (EP);
F01D25/002 (EP);
F01D9/042 (FI);
F05D2230/60 (EP);
F05D2230/72 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2017/34] | F01D9/04, F01D17/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Title | German: | STATORMECHANISMUS, TURBINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR WARTUNG DES STATORMECHANISMUS | [2017/34] | English: | A STATOR MECHANISM, A TURBINE AND A METHOD FOR MAINTENANCE OF THE STATOR MECHANISM | [2017/34] | French: | MÉCANISME DE STATOR, TURBINE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRETIEN DU MÉCANISME DE STATOR | [2017/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 16.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 16.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 29.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018 | 31.10.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US3314654 (SPENCER THENAULT GEORGES, et al) [X] 1,7,9-12,16,17,19,21 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 3; figure - * [A] 2-6,8,13-15,20 [Y] 18; | [Y]US2013115056 (HASHIMOTO SHINYA [JP], et al) [Y] 18 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0070]; figure - * | International search | [XA]US3314654 (SPENCER THENAULT GEORGES, et al) [X] 1, 7, 9-12, 16, 17, 19, 21 * figures 1-4; column 3, lines 46-59; column 4, lines 21-53 * [A] 2-6, 8, 13-15, 18, 20; | [A]US2014255177 (CADIEUX MICHEL [CA]) [A] 1, 20, 21 * paragraphs [0014], [0016]-[0019]; figures 1, 3-7 * |