EP3181658 - QUANTUM DOT, POLYMER RESIN, QUANTUM DOT SHEET, AND BACKLIGHT UNIT INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heesung Electronics Co., Ltd 9 Dokseodang-ro 14-gil Yongsan-gu Seoul 04410 / KR | [2017/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Na Rae 805- 404 75 Ansim-ro 22-gil Dong-gu Daegu 41099 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Hyun Seok 106- 901 13 Ssangyong 17-gil Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31173 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Do Eok 102- 1004 7 Guam-ro 16-gil Buk-gu Daegu 41460 / KR | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Scheele Jaeger Wetzel Patentanwälte Goethestraße 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | RatnerPrestia Altheimer Eck 2 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15851621.1 | 14.12.2015 | [2017/25] | WO2015KR13672 | Priority number, date | KR20150143954 | 15.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150143954 | [2017/25] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017065349 | Date: | 20.04.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3181658 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.04.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/08, C09K11/02, C08L33/06, G02F1/1335, G02F1/017, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, B82Y20/00, C08F2/50, F21V9/30 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
C09K11/08 (EP,US);
F21V9/30 (US);
C08F2/50 (EP,US);
C08L33/06 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
G02B6/005 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
G02B1/045 (EP,US);
Y10S977/774 (EP,US);
Y10S977/783 (EP,US);
Y10S977/896 (EP,US);
Y10S977/95 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/25] | C09K11/08, C09K11/02, C08L33/06, G02F1/1335, G02F1/017 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/25] | Title | German: | QUANTENPUNKT, POLYMERHARZ, QUANTENPUNKTFOLIE UND RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT DAMIT | [2017/25] | English: | QUANTUM DOT, POLYMER RESIN, QUANTUM DOT SHEET, AND BACKLIGHT UNIT INCLUDING SAME | [2017/25] | French: | POINT QUANTIQUE, RÉSINE POLYMÈRE, FEUILLE DE POINTS QUANTIQUES, ET UNITÉ DE RÉTRO-ÉCLAIRAGE LES COMPRENANT | [2017/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2016 | Translation filed | 25.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2016 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 25.04.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 26.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ANGSHUMAN NAG ET AL, "Metal-free Inorganic Ligands for Colloidal Nanocrystals: S 2- , HS - , Se 2- , HSe - , Te 2- , HTe - , TeS 3 2- , OH - , and NH 2 - as Surface Ligands", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20110713), vol. 133, no. 27, doi:10.1021/ja2029415, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 10612 - 10620, XP055077806 [X] 1-3 * page 10613 * * page 10615 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 4,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja2029415 | International search | [A]KR20110094996 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11* See abstract; claims 1-15; and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20130042372 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * See abstract; and claims 1-29. *; | [X]KR20140089549 (THREE BOND FINE CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 6 * See paragraphs [0015] and [0051]-[0072]; and table 1-1. *; | [X]KR20150004180 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 9-11 * See paragraphs [0131]-[0156]; and figure 16. *; | [A]KR20150040608 (LG DISPLAY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-11 * See paragraphs [0074]-[0077]; and figure 3. *; | [XA] - NAG, ANGSHUMAN et al., "Metal-free Inorganic Ligands for Colloidal Nanocrystals: S2-, HS-, Se2-, HSe-, Te2-, HTe-, TeS3(2-), OH-, and NH2- as Surface Ligands", Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20110000), vol. 133, no. 27, pages 10612 - 10620, XP055077806 [X] 1-5 * See abstract; page 10613, right column, lines 3-20 and 42-44; page 10615, right column, lines 22-25; and figures 1 and 2. * [A] 6-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja2029415 |