08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
04.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
26.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
26.06.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
23.06.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
01.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.12.2017 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
28.12.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
24.11.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
24.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
24.11.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
31.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
28.07.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
28.07.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
25.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|