EP3210069 - OPTICAL PRODUCTS, MASTERS FOR FABRICATING OPTICAL PRODUCTS, AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING MASTERS AND OPTICAL PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wavefront Technology, Inc. 7350 Somerset Blvd Paramount, CA 90723 / US | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICH, Christopher, Chapman 7350 Somerset Blvd. Paramount, PA 90723 / US | 02 /
HARVEY, Phillip, Christopher 3605 Senasac Avenue Long Beach, CA 90808 / US | 03 /
PETERSEN, Joel, Mikael 7350 Somerset Blvd. Paramount, CA 90723 / US | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15853476.8 | 23.10.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015US57235 | Priority number, date | US201462068540P | 24.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462068540 P | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016065331 | Date: | 28.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3210069 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/324, B42D25/328, B42D25/373, B42D25/23, B42D25/24, B42D25/29, B42D25/425, B42D25/45, G02B27/22, G02B5/09, G02B6/42 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
G02B30/40 (EP,US);
B42D25/23 (EP);
B42D25/24 (EP);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B42D25/324 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (EP);
B42D25/425 (EP);
B42D25/45 (EP);
G02B3/0031 (EP);
G02B30/56 (EP);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | G02B27/22, G02B6/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE PRODUKTE, VORLAGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG OPTISCHER PRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VORLAGEN UND OPTISCHEN PRODUKTE | [2017/35] | English: | OPTICAL PRODUCTS, MASTERS FOR FABRICATING OPTICAL PRODUCTS, AND METHODS FOR MANUFACTURING MASTERS AND OPTICAL PRODUCTS | [2017/35] | French: | PRODUITS OPTIQUES, GABARITS POUR LA FABRICATION DE PRODUITS OPTIQUES, ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE GABARITS ET DE PRODUITS OPTIQUES | [2017/35] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 08.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2006013215 (OPTAGLIO SRO [CZ], et al); | [XYI]WO2011066990 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [XY]US2013052373 (NOIZET ALEXANDRE [FR], et al); | [XY]WO2014060089 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) | International search | [Y]US4681451 (GUERRA JOHN M [US], et al); | [XYA]US2003179364 (STEENBLIK RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]US7729026 (ARGOITIA ALBERTO [US], et al); | [Y]US2010172000 (HOLMES BRIAN [GB]); | [Y]US2014184599 (QUILOT LAURENT [FR], et al) | by applicant | WO2006013215 | WO2011066990 | US2013052373 | WO2014060089 |