EP3214238 - KEY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Lock 3700 Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-shi, Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA Akimitsu c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA HONDA LOCK 3700 Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-shi Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | 02 /
CHOOCHAI Hongtong c/o Honda Lock R&D Asia Co. Ltd. Amata Nakorn Industrial Estate 700/301 MOO 6 Donhuaroh Muang Chonburi 20000 / TH | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15854006.2 | 21.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP79727 | Priority number, date | JP20140220536 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014220536 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016068000 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214238 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E05B19/00, E05B17/18, E05B19/04, E05B47/00, E05B19/14, E05B35/14, E05B17/14 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
E05B17/18 (EP);
E05B17/142 (EP);
E05B19/00 (EP);
E05B19/043 (EP);
E05B19/14 (EP);
E05B35/14 (EP);
E05B47/0045 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | E05B19/00, E05B17/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSELEINHEIT | [2017/36] | English: | KEY UNIT | [2017/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE CLÉ | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2017 | Translation filed | 23.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 23.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6012056Y (MATSUKYU CO., LTD.) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 *[Y] 2-4; | [X]US2005012594 (SHIM YOUNGTACK [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0033]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JP3914043B (HONDA LOCK MFG CO LTD) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008168811 (NAGELSKI KEITH C [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]US8763434 (DAVID MARC [FR], et al) [Y] 2 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]JPS6012056Y (Matsukyu Co., Ltd.) [X] 1 * , column 3, lines 3 to 28; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]JPH09317268 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [Y] 3-4* , paragraphs [0003] to [0004]; fig. 6 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]US2006016231 (KHOUNSOMBATH SAYSAMON [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0035]; fig. 11 to 14 (Family: none) * |