EP3213742 - WATER-IN-OIL EMULSION SUNSCREEN COSMETIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiseido Company Ltd. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAKI, Satoshi c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Kazutaka c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 03 /
MATSUI, Takashi c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 22-48558 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Yurika c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 05 /
TASHIRO, Mayuri c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 06 /
NAGARE, Yuko c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 07 /
TOUATI, Marianne Ayaka c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 08 /
YAMAGUCHI, Kazuhiro c/o SHISEIDO RESEARCH CENTER (SHIN-YOKOHAMA) 2-2-1 Hayabuchi Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/36] |
Former [2017/36] | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15854207.6 | 30.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP80764 | Priority number, date | JP20140222962 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014222962 | JP20150201594 | 09.10.2015 Original published format: JP 2015201594 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016068298 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213742 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3213742 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/73, A61K8/06, A61K8/25, A61K8/27, A61K8/36, A61K8/37, A61K8/40, A61K8/44, A61K8/49, A61K8/60, A61K8/894, A61K8/895, A61Q17/04, A61K8/58, A61K8/81, A61K8/891 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
A61K8/064 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (KR,US);
A61K8/06 (KR,US);
A61K8/25 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/36 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/40 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/49 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/585 (US);
A61K8/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/732 (EP);
A61K8/8129 (US);
A61K8/891 (US);
A61K8/894 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/895 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | A61K8/73, A61K8/06, A61K8/25, A61K8/27, A61K8/36, A61K8/37, A61K8/40, A61K8/44, A61K8/49, A61K8/60, A61K8/894, A61K8/895, A61Q17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SONNENSCHUTZ-KOSMETIKARTIKEL IN FORM EINER WASSER-IN-ÖL-EMULSION | [2017/36] | English: | WATER-IN-OIL EMULSION SUNSCREEN COSMETIC | [2017/36] | French: | PRODUIT COSMÉTIQUE DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE SOUS FORME D'ÉMULSION EAU-DANS-HUILE | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2017 | Translation filed | 28.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 30.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 30.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009098169 (OOTAKE SOUICHIROU [JP], et al); | [I]WO2009119000 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP], et al); | [I]US2012201905 (MUNE YORIKO [JP], et al); | [I]US2013121939 (FUKUHARA KAZUTO [JP]); | [A]US2014148516 (SASAKI KAZUTAKA [JP], et al); | [I]US2014205552 (FUKUHARA KAZUTO [JP]) | International search | [XY]JP2000063233 (KOSE CORP); | [A]JP2000072646 (CHIBA FLOUR MILLING); | [Y]JP2004083541 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JP2009040738 (POLA CHEM IND INC); | [XYA]JP2011126832 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [XYA]JP2011153079 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | Examination | JP2004083541 | JP2011126832 |