EP3214300 - ENGINE, SELF-STARTER UNIT, AND METHOD FOR ALTERING ENGINE SPECIFICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Meiki Engines Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 453-0862 / JP | [2018/21] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Meiki Engines Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Takamichi Iwatsuka-cho Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4530862 / JP | ||
Former [2017/36] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKI Kazuhiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15854998.0 | 29.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP80597 | Priority number, date | JP20140219908 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014219908 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016068253 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214300 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01P1/06, F02N3/02, F02N11/00, F02N11/08, F02B67/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
F02N11/00 (EP,US);
F02N11/0859 (KR);
F02N11/0862 (EP,KR,US);
F01P1/02 (EP);
F01P1/06 (US);
F02B67/00 (KR,US);
F02N11/08 (US);
F02N11/087 (US);
F02N3/02 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | F02N11/08, F02B67/00, F02N3/02, F02N11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | MOTOR, SELBSTSTARTEREINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER MOTORSPEZIFIKATIONEN | [2017/36] | English: | ENGINE, SELF-STARTER UNIT, AND METHOD FOR ALTERING ENGINE SPECIFICATIONS | [2017/36] | French: | MOTEUR, UNITÉ DE DÉMARREUR, ET PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION DE SPÉCIFICATIONS DE MOTEUR | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2017 | Translation filed | 18.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 18.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH02248652 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [Y] 1, 4-10 * , page 3, upper right column, line 10 to page 4, upper left column, line 10; fig. 1, 2, 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH02248653 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [Y] 10 * , fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11280626 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 2, 3* , fig. 1, 2 & US 6199529 B1 fig. 1, 2 *; | [Y]JP2014148966 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [Y] 1, 4-10 * , paragraph [0018] (Family: none) * |