Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10682276 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | B2 | US2017239125 | 24.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP78925 | 13.10.2015 | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6368793B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B2 | JPWO2016067911 | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP78925 | 13.10.2015 | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107106397B | Global Dossier | 19.01.2021 | B | CN107106397 | 29.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP78925 | 13.10.2015 | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3213732 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2022 | B1 | EP3213732 | 18.07.2018 | A4 | EP3213732 | 06.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP78925 | 13.10.2015 | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2909477T | 06.05.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2015JP78925 | 13.10.2015 | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016067911 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201620585 | 16.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014220050 | 29.10.2014 |