EP3213732 - TRAINING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING FORCE COMPONENT SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINATO, Yuichiro c/o Murata Machinery Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Fumi c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Akihiro c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | 04 /
TAKEDA, Jun c/o Teijin Pharma Limited 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | [2022/08] |
Former [2017/36] | 01 /
MINATO, Yuichiro c/o MURATA MACHINERY LTD. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJITA, Fumi c/o TEIJIN PHARMA LIMITED 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
MAEDA, Akihiro c/o TEIJIN PHARMA LIMITED 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKEDA, Jun c/o TEIJIN PHARMA LIMITED 2-1 Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15855137.4 | 13.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP78925 | Priority number, date | JP20140220050 | 29.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014220050 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016067911 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3213732 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3213732 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02, A63B21/005, A63B21/02, A63B23/035, A63B23/12, A63B21/00, // A63B22/00, A63B71/00, A63B71/06 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
A61H1/0237 (EP,US);
A61H1/0274 (EP,US);
A63B21/00178 (EP,US);
A63B21/0058 (EP,US);
A63B21/4035 (EP,US);
A63B21/4047 (EP,US);
A63B23/03508 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1215 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1463 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1633 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1635 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1638 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1685 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5035 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5041 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5064 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5069 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5092 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5097 (EP,US);
A61H2203/0431 (EP,US);
A63B2022/0094 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0658 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0683 (EP,US);
A63B21/023 (EP,US);
A63B2208/0233 (EP,US);
A63B2220/20 (EP,US);
A63B2220/24 (EP,US);
A63B2220/51 (EP,US);
A63B2220/805 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | A61H1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAININGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR VON KRAFTKOMPONENTENSIGNALEN | [2021/51] | English: | TRAINING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING FORCE COMPONENT SIGNALS | [2017/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION DE SIGNAUX DE COMPOSANTE DE FORCE | [2017/36] |
Former [2017/36] | TRAININGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORREKTUR VON KRAFTKOMPONENTENSIGNALE | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2017 | Translation filed | 26.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 26.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2015 | AL | 23.02.2022 | AT | 23.02.2022 | CY | 23.02.2022 | CZ | 23.02.2022 | DK | 23.02.2022 | EE | 23.02.2022 | FI | 23.02.2022 | HR | 23.02.2022 | LT | 23.02.2022 | LV | 23.02.2022 | MC | 23.02.2022 | MK | 23.02.2022 | MT | 23.02.2022 | NL | 23.02.2022 | PL | 23.02.2022 | RO | 23.02.2022 | RS | 23.02.2022 | SE | 23.02.2022 | SI | 23.02.2022 | SK | 23.02.2022 | SM | 23.02.2022 | BG | 23.05.2022 | NO | 23.05.2022 | GR | 24.05.2022 | IS | 23.06.2022 | PT | 23.06.2022 | IE | 13.10.2022 | LU | 13.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 13.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
MK | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 13.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CY | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.10.2015 | |
AL | 23.02.2022 | ||
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.10.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
MC | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SI | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
AT | 23.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SK | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
CZ | 23.02.2022 | ||
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
EE | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RO | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
SM | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
DK | 23.02.2022 | ||
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
IS | 23.06.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
FI | 23.02.2022 | ||
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 23.02.2022 | |
HR | 23.02.2022 | ||
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
LV | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
PL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
GR | 24.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.02.2022 | |
LT | 23.02.2022 | ||
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
RS | 23.02.2022 | ||
SE | 23.02.2022 | ||
BG | 23.05.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NL | 23.02.2022 | ||
NO | 23.05.2022 | ||
PT | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.02.2022 | |
NO | 23.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004172097 (BRODARD ROLAND [CH], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1,8,12,13 * [I] 2-12; | [Y]US2008287261 (PULNIKOV SERGEY [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0035] , [0059]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP2682088 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0039] , [0040]; figure - *; | [A]EP2687341 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0029] , [0073] , [0085] , [0099] - [0105] - [0144] , [0145]; figures 1,7,12,22,23 * | International search | [A]JP2000279463 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007037667 (UNIV SAGA) [A] 1-13* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012117488 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |