EP3214352 - CONNECTION STRUCTURE FOR VALVE AND JOINT IN AIR PIPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitta Corporation 4-26, Sakuragawa 4-chome Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-0022 / JP | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Yasuaki c/o Nitta Corporation Nabari Plant 1300-45 Yabata Nabari-shi Mie 518-0494 / JP | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15855378.4 | 14.09.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015JP76033 | Priority number, date | JP20140222397 | 31.10.2014 Original published format: JP 2014222397 | [2017/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016067774 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3214352 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K27/00, F16L37/091 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
F16L37/0915 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/0847 (US);
F16K27/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16L21/08 (KR);
F16L33/22 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | F16L37/12, F16K27/00, F16L21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR FÜR VENTIL UND VERBINDUNGSSTÜCK IN LUFTROHRLEITUNGEN | [2017/36] | English: | CONNECTION STRUCTURE FOR VALVE AND JOINT IN AIR PIPING | [2017/36] | French: | STRUCTURE DE LIAISON POUR SOUPAPE ET RACCORD DANS UNE TUBULURE D'AIR | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2017 | Translation filed | 24.04.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 24.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/14] | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0268251 (SMC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 20 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 40 * * figure 2 * [A] 2,3; | [YA]US5474336 (HOFF STEVEN R [US], et al) [Y] 2 * abstract * [A] 1,3; | [A]FR2735844 (LEGRIS SA [FR]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0957306 (SMC KK [JP]) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2; | [IA]WO03027562 (LEGRIS SA [FR], et al) [I] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 2; | [A]DE102010019673 (WABCO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3* paragraph [0010]; figure . * | International search | [A]JPH0399295U (CKD Corp.) [A] 1-3 * , specification, page 9, line 10 to page 16, line 16; all drawings & US 5160179 A column 4, line 14 to column 6, line 49; all drawings & WO 1991/007618 A1 & DE 4091925 C & DE 4091925 T & KR 10-1995-0003297 B *; | [A]US5174611 (BYRD GENE S [US], et al) [A] 1-3* , fig. 5 & WO 1992/020949 A1 *; | [Y]JPH07269767 (USUI INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRY) [Y] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0007] to [0012]; fig. 4, 6, 8, 9, 11 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2004514851 (Festo AG. & Co.) [Y] 1-3 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0038]; all drawings & US 2003/0001383 A1 paragraphs [0021] to [0052]; all drawings & WO 2002/042676 A1 & EP 1250547 A & DE 50102998 D & DE 200020052 U1 * |