EP3212050 - COOKING UTENSIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steenkamp, Sarah-May 25 Baviaanskloof Estate Baviaanskloof Road Hout Bay 7806 Cape Town / ZA | For all designated states Cronwright, Keith Louis Featherstone 25 Baviaanskloof Estate Baviaanskloof Road Hout Bay 7806 Cape Town / ZA | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRONWRIGHT, Keith Louis Featherstone 25 Baviaanskloof Estate Baviaanskloof Road, Hout Bay 7806 Cape Town / ZA | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark Firebird IP 27 Old Gloucester Street London WC1N 3AX / GB | [2017/36] | Application number, filing date | 15855389.1 | 28.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015IB58297 | Priority number, date | ZA20140007839 | 28.10.2014 Original published format: ZA 201407839 | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016067208 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3212050 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 23.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/18, A47J37/10, A47J37/07, A47J43/28, A47J45/06 | [2017/52] | CPC: |
A47J43/18 (EP,US);
A47J37/0786 (EP,US);
A47J37/108 (EP,US);
A47J43/283 (EP,US);
A47J45/061 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | A47J43/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Title | German: | KOCHUTENSIL | [2017/36] | English: | COOKING UTENSIL | [2017/36] | French: | USTENSILE DE CUISSON | [2017/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 29.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2564720 (ROUPSARD HENRI [FR]) [A] 1-9,14,15 * figure 2 *; | [XI]DE3839097 (RESTAURANT TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-3,5,15 * figures 4,10-14; claims 9,10 * [I] 4,6-9,14; | [I]WO0226092 (MCKEAND PETER WILSON [GB], et al) [I] 1-9,14,15 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3; figure 3 *; | [A]US1143253 (CONSTANTINE NICOLAE [US]) [A] 7-9,14 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE202009010977U (BRADER LEONHARD [DE]) [A] 14 * figures 1,3,4,7 * | International search | [X]DE3839097 (RESTAURANT TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1, 2; figures 2. 4, 8, 9 *; | [X]DE202012010218U (GOETZ JOHANN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * whole document * |