Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3212289 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3212289



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(56)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 352
04.12.2024 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
25.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.09.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
25.09.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 40
25.09.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
25.09.2023 Description Search / examination 31
25.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.09.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.05.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.05.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.09.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.09.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 40
29.09.2022 Description Search / examination 31
29.09.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.09.2022 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.06.2022 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
14.06.2022 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.06.2022 Examination started Search / examination 1
07.06.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 41
07.06.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.11.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.11.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.11.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
19.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.05.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 5
18.04.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
27.03.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
16.03.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
06.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.03.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
04.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.01.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
04.01.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
04.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.12.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
09.08.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.06.2017 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.05.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
10.05.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
10.03.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.01.2017 Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data Search / examination 2
03.01.2017 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable Search / examination 1
24.05.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
06.05.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
06.05.2016 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 49