EP3212110 - SYSTEMS FOR ANATOMICAL REGISTRATION AND SURGICAL LOCALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/36] | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ANATOMICAL REGISTRATION AND SURGICAL LOCALIZATION | ||
[2023/39] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellijoint Surgical Inc. 60 Bathurst Drive Unit 1 Waterloo, Ontario N2V 2A9 / CA | [2017/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HLADIO, Andre Novomir 96 Beech Street Ottawa, Ontario K1S 3J8 / CA | 02 /
BAKIRTZIAN, Armen Garo M72-85 Bankside Drive Kitchener, Ontario N2N 3M4 / CA | 03 /
FANSON, Richard Tyler 829 Stirling Avenue South Kitchener, Ontario N2M 3K4 / CA | 04 /
RYTERSKI, Eric 941 Garfield Avenue Louisville, CO 80027 / US | [2017/36] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF BV Benoordenhoutseweg 46 2596 BC The Hague / NL | [2024/09] |
Former [2017/36] | HGF Limited Zuid-Hollandlaan 7 2596 AL The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 15856161.3 | 29.10.2015 | [2017/36] | WO2015CA00558 | Priority number, date | US201462072041P | 29.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462072041 P | US201462072030P | 29.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462072030 P | US201462072032P | 29.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462072032 P | US201462084891P | 26.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462084891 P | [2017/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016065457 | Date: | 06.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3212110 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3212110 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 06.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B34/20 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B17/1703 (US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B46/10 (US);
A61B5/6847 (US);
A61B90/06 (US);
A61B90/30 (US);
A61B90/361 (US);
G06T7/337 (US);
G06T7/74 (US);
A61B2034/105 (US);
A61B2034/2048 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2057 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2065 (US);
A61B2034/2068 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2072 (EP,US);
A61B2090/061 (US);
A61B2090/064 (US);
A61B2090/067 (EP,US);
A61B2090/364 (US);
A61B2090/373 (US);
A61B2090/3937 (US);
A61B2090/3983 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30008 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/36] | A61B34/20, A61B17/74, A61B17/88 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME ZUR ANATOMISCHEN REGISTRIERUNG UND CHIRURGISCHEN LOKALISIERUNG | [2023/39] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR ANATOMICAL REGISTRATION AND SURGICAL LOCALIZATION | [2023/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES POUR ALIGNEMENT ANATOMIQUE ET LOCALISATION CHIRURGICALE | [2023/39] |
Former [2017/36] | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ANATOMISCHEN REGISTRIERUNG UND CHIRURGISCHEN LOKALISIERUNG | ||
Former [2017/36] | SYSTEMS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ANATOMICAL REGISTRATION AND SURGICAL LOCALIZATION | ||
Former [2017/36] | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR ALIGNEMENT ANATOMIQUE ET LOCALISATION CHIRURGICALE | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 19.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.12.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102011050240 (HANNOVER MED HOCHSCHULE [DE]); | [XI]US2014247336 (VILSMEIER STEFAN [DE], et al); | [A]US2014276943 (BOWLING DAVID GENE [US], et al); | [XPI]WO2015022084 (BRAINLAB AG [DE]) | International search | [A]WO2006075331 (MAZOR SURGICAL TECH LTD [IL], et al); | [A]WO2006128301 (ORTHOSOFT INC [CA], et al); | [A]US2010069919 (CARLS THOMAS [US], et al) | by applicant | US8000926 | DE102011050240 | US2014247336 | US2014275940 | WO2015022084 |