EP3216858 - AGENT FOR MAINTAINING STEM CELLS IN UNDIFFERENTIATED STATE AND AGENT FOR PROMOTING GROWTH THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Menard Cosmetic Co., Ltd. 130 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Seiji c/o Research Institute Nippon Menard Cosmetic Co., Ltd. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | 02 /
INOUE, Yu c/o Research Institute Nippon Menard Cosmetic Co., Ltd. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | 03 /
HASEBE, Yuichi c/o Research Institute Nippon Menard Cosmetic Co., Ltd. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | 04 /
SAKAIDA, Tsutomu c/o Research Institute Nippon Menard Cosmetic Co., Ltd. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | [2020/40] |
Former [2017/37] | 01 /
HASEGAWA Seiji c/o Research Institute NIPPON MENARD COSMETIC CO. LTD. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | ||
02 /
INOUE Yu c/o Research Institute NIPPON MENARD COSMETIC CO. LTD. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | |||
03 /
HASEBE Yuichi c/o Research Institute NIPPON MENARD COSMETIC CO. LTD. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | |||
04 /
SAKAIDA Tsutomu c/o Research Institute NIPPON MENARD COSMETIC CO. LTD. 7 Torimicho 2-chome Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 451-0071 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15856813.9 | 05.11.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015JP81109 | Priority number, date | JP20140226389 | 06.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014226389 | [2017/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016072435 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3216858 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3216858 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/232, A61K31/231, A61P17/02, C12N5/0735, A23L33/10, A61K8/37, A61K35/12, A61P43/00, A61Q19/00, C12N5/074, C12N15/09 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/231 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0018 (RU);
C12N5/0602 (KR);
C07C69/602 (RU,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L33/115 (KR);
A23L33/12 (RU,US);
A61K31/232 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K8/0216 (US);
A61K8/042 (RU,US);
A61K8/06 (US);
A61K8/37 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/375 (US);
A61K9/0095 (RU,US);
A61K9/06 (US);
A61K9/107 (US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61P17/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07C69/52 (US);
C07C69/587 (US);
C12N5/0606 (KR,US);
C12N5/0621 (RU);
A23V2002/00 (KR,US);
A23V2200/318 (KR);
A23V2250/194 (KR);
A61K2800/74 (US);
C12N15/09 (EP,US);
C12N2500/36 (KR);
C12N2501/999 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | C12N5/0735, A23L33/10, A61K8/37, A61K31/231, A61K35/12, A61P43/00, A61Q19/00, C12N5/074, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEWAHRUNG VON STAMMZELLEN IN UNDIFFERENZIERTEM ZUSTAND UND MITTEL ZUR WACHSTUMSFÖRDERUNG DAFÜR | [2017/37] | English: | AGENT FOR MAINTAINING STEM CELLS IN UNDIFFERENTIATED STATE AND AGENT FOR PROMOTING GROWTH THEREOF | [2017/37] | French: | AGENT DESTINÉ À MAINTENIR DES CELLULES SOUCHES À L'ÉTAT INDIFFÉRENCIÉ ET AGENT DESTINÉ À FAVORISER LEUR CROISSANCE | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2017 | Translation filed | 31.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 31.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 31.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 31.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2015 | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | MT | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | TR | 30.09.2020 | IE | 05.11.2020 | LU | 05.11.2020 | BE | 30.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | GB | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | DE | 01.06.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
MT | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
TR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.11.2015 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MT | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
TR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
DE | 01.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 05.11.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 05.11.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005059114 ; | [IA]WO9926640 (BUKWANG PHARM IND CO LTD [KR], et al); | [X]WO0185158 (FORSKARPATENT I SYD AB [SE], et al); | [X]EP1897530 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]); | [IA]WO2010006261 (HONG JOHN J [US]); | [X]WO2011064524 (CRODA INT PLC [GB], et al); | International search | [X]JPH06503085 ; | [X]JP2002532531 ; | [X]JP2005047904 (YAKULT HONSHA KK); | [X]WO2009081611 (TAIYO KK [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2009147400 (ITI SCOTLAND LTD [GB], et al); | [XY]JP2010502662 ; | [X]JP2010120860 (NIPPON MENAADE KESHOHIN KK) | Examination | KR20130058299 | BRPI0504469 | WO9609810 | EP1452175 | US2007142306 | WO2008143928 | EP3153163 |