|
13.01.2021 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.10.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.02.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.05.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
16.03.2017 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.03.2017 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Despatch of copy of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Result of consultation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Separate sheet with IPEA428 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.09.2016 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.09.2016 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
01.09.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.09.2016 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.05.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
24 |