29.01.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
13.01.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
01.09.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
24.02.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.06.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.03.2019 |
First examination report |
|
27.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.01.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
05.01.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
05.01.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
25.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
11.08.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.08.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
27.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
31.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|