Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017313482 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 | WO2015SE51153 | 02.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11111062 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | B2 | US2019177055 | 13.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 | US201916278979 | 19.02.2019 | US201715523810 | 02.05.2017 | WO2015SE51153 | 02.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107108068 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 | WO2015SE51153 | 02.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3215428 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | A4 | EP3215428 | 13.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 | WO2015SE51153 | 02.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016072913 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR102503 | 01.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE1451309 | 04.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1451309 | 03.11.2014 |