EP3217677 - AV SIGNAL TRANSCEIVING SYSTEM, SINK DEVICE, METHOD FOR TRANSCEIVING AV SIGNAL, AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AV SIGNAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOZUKA, Masayuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co..Ltd. 1-61, shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
USUKI, Naoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co..Ltd. 1-61, shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NISHIO, Toshiroh c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co..Ltd. 1-61, shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Satoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co..Ltd. 1-61, shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
NISHI, Takahiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co..Ltd. 1-61, shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/37] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2017/37] | Application number, filing date | 15857811.2 | 18.08.2015 | [2017/37] | WO2015JP04084 | Priority number, date | US201462075395P | 05.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462075395 P | JP20150067661 | 27.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015067661 | [2017/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016072037 | Date: | 12.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3217677 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3217677 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/436, H04N5/775, H04N21/4363 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N21/40 (US);
G11B27/031 (US);
H04N21/436 (EP,US);
H04N21/43635 (EP,US);
H04N5/44 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/37] | H04N21/436 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AV-SIGNAL-SENDEEMPFANGSSYSTEM, SENKENVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN/EMPFANGEN EINES AV-SIGNALS UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES AV-SIGNALS | [2017/37] | English: | AV SIGNAL TRANSCEIVING SYSTEM, SINK DEVICE, METHOD FOR TRANSCEIVING AV SIGNAL, AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AV SIGNAL | [2017/37] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉMISSION-RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL AV, DISPOSITIF COLLECTEUR, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION-RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL AV, ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION DE SIGNAL AV | [2017/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2017 | Translation filed | 20.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2015 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IE | 18.08.2020 | LU | 18.08.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.08.2015 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IE | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IE | 18.08.2020 | ||
LU | 18.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 18.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 18.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 18.08.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009027405 (KAGA KATSUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-12 * figures 1, 5 and 9 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0134] * [Y] 3; | [Y]JP2010028552 (SONY CORP) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0006] ** paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0101] * | International search | [XY]JP2009033446 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1, 2, 4-12 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0037], [0058] to [0072]; fig. 5, 9 & US 2009/0027405 A1 & EP 2031577 A2 & EP 2793218 A2 & CN 101355672 A * [Y] 3; | [Y]JP2010028552 (SONY CORP) [Y] 3 * , paragraphs [0006], [0092] to [0101]; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010154241 (CANON KK) [A] 1-12* , entire text; all drawings & US 2010/0165198 A1 & US 2013/0293785 A1 * |