EP3218300 - MICROFLUIDIC PLATFORM FOR INVESTIGATING CELL-BASED INTERACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIM Biotech Pte. Ltd. 51 Ayer Rajah Crescent, 02-12/14 Singapore 139948 / SG | [2024/40] |
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states AIM Biotech Pte. Ltd. 51 Ayer Rajah Crescent, 02-12/14 Singapore 139948 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAVESI, Andrea 206 Depot Road no. 08-52 Singapore 109697 / SG | 02 /
LIM, Sei Hien 701 Yishun Avenue 5 no. 11-300 Singapore 760701 / SG | 03 /
LIM, Swee Khuan 9 Canberra Drive Nr.11-19 Singapore 768070 / SG | 04 /
KUAN, Chee Mun 136B Hillview Avenue no. 03-03 Singapore 669607 / SG | [2018/36] |
Former [2017/38] | 01 /
PAVESI, Andrea 206 Depot Road no. 08-52 Singapore 109697 / SG | ||
02 /
LIM, Sei Hien 701 Yishun Avenue 5 no. 11-300 Singapore 760701 / SG | |||
03 /
LIM, Swee Khuan 629 Woodlands Ring Road no. 13-238 Singapore 730629 / SG | |||
04 /
KUAN, Chee Mun 136B Hillview Avenue no. 03-03 Singapore 669607 / SG | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2024/40] |
Former [2017/38] | Smart, Jessica Ann, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15859297.2 | 09.11.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015SG50441 | Priority number, date | US201462077942P | 11.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462077942 P | [2017/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016076795 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3218300 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3218300 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B81B1/00, B01L3/00, B81C1/00, C12M3/00, C12M1/00, C12M3/06, C12M1/32 | [2018/29] | CPC: |
C12M23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C12M23/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,KR,US);
C12M23/22 (EP,KR,US);
C12M23/24 (US);
C12M23/40 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/0684 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0809 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | B81B1/00, B01L3/00, B81C1/00, C12M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFLUIDISCHE PLATTFORM ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG VON WECHSELWIRKUNGEN AUF ZELLBASIS | [2017/38] | English: | MICROFLUIDIC PLATFORM FOR INVESTIGATING CELL-BASED INTERACTIONS | [2017/38] | French: | PLATEFORME MICROFLUIDIQUE POUR L'ÉTUDE D'INTERACTIONS À BASE DE CELLULES | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 09.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.11.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012050981 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al); | [X]WO2013019491 (DENOVO SCIENCES [US], et al); | [X]US2014044610 (MIYOSHI YUICHI [JP], et al) | International search | [XA]US2002114739 (WEIGL BERNARD H [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 16-19 * Abstract, paragraphs 0018 to 0020, figure 1 Abstract, paragraphs 0003, 0010 to 0014, 0018 to 0025, figures 1 to 3 * [A] 4-15, 20-31; | [XA]US2005266582 (MODLIN DOUGLAS N [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs 0105, 0114 to 0117, 0126, 0128, 0160 to 0162, 0167, 0168, 0209, 0210, 0225, 0250, Table 1, figures 6, 17, 49, 50 and 62 Abstract, paragraphs 0002, 0015, 0105 to 0318, figures 6 to 90 * [A] 25-31; | [A]WO9855852 (CALIPER TECHN CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * Abstract, page 3 line 24 to page 6 line 32, page 7 line 33 to page 17 line 36, figures 1 to 9 *; | [A]WO2010056755 (CRAIG H RANDALL [US]) [A] 1-31 * Abstract, page 10 line 25 to page 12 line 22, page 15 line 17 to page 41 line 26, figures 14 to 86 *; | [A]US2010056394 (CHANG YAW-JEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-31 * Abstract, paragraphs 0014 to 0021, figures 1 to 4 * | [XA] - MAIR, D.A. et al., "Injection molded microfluidic chips featuring integrated interconnects", Lab on a Chip, vol. 6, (20060000), pages 1346 - 1354, XP055441078 [X] 1-3, 16-19 * Abstract, Injection Molding, Optical Properties of COC, Mold insert fabrication, Interconnects, Bonding and burst pressure measurement, figure 5A, 5B, and 6B Whole document * [A] 4-15, 20-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B605911B |