EP3220315 - SYSTEM, METHOD, AND PROGRAM FOR PREDICTING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mizuho Research & Technologies, Ltd. 2-3, Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | [2021/25] |
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states Mizuho Information & Research Institute, Inc. 2-3, Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Takeshi c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 02 /
MAEKAWA, Hidemasa c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 03 /
SUITANI, Makiko c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 04 /
TOMOZAWA, Hiromitsu c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 05 /
MATSUZAKI, Kazutoshi c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 06 /
SANO, Akira c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 07 /
HAGIWARA, Toru c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | 08 /
HIZUKURI, Akiyoshi c/o MIZUHO INFORMATION&RESEARCH INSTITUTE INC. 2-3 Kanda-Nishikicho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8443 / JP | [2017/38] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2017/38] | Application number, filing date | 15859531.4 | 29.09.2015 | [2017/38] | WO2015JP77529 | Priority number, date | JP20140231089 | 13.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014231089 | [2017/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016076026 | Date: | 19.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220315 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3220315 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00, G06N5/04 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
G06N5/04 (EP,KR,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,KR,US);
G06T3/40 (KR,US);
G06T3/4053 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | G06N99/00, G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM ZUR VORHERSAGE VON INFORMATIONEN | [2017/38] | English: | SYSTEM, METHOD, AND PROGRAM FOR PREDICTING INFORMATION | [2017/38] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME POUR PRÉDIRE DES INFORMATIONS | [2017/38] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2017 | Translation filed | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/38] | 11.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2021 | 05.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP22164213.5 / EP4044074 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2015 | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | MK | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | IE | 29.09.2022 | LU | 29.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 29.09.2015 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CY | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 29.09.2015 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
IE | 29.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 29.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011026849 (KAMEYAMA HIROKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011305404 (LIN CHIA-WEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I] - WEI LIU ET AL, "Hallucinating Faces: TensorPatch Super-Resolution and Coupled Residue Compensation", PROCEEDINGS / 2005 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, CVPR 2005 : [20 - 25 JUNE 2005, SAN DIEGO, CA], IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20050620), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/CVPR.2005.172, ISBN 978-0-7695-2372-9, pages 478 - 484, XP010817635 [I] 1-7 * the whole document * * section 3 - section 4 * * figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2005.172 | [A] - JIANCHAO YANG ET AL, "Image Super-Resolution Via Sparse Representation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101101), vol. 19, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TIP.2010.2050625, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 2861 - 2873, XP011328631 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2010.2050625 | [A] - MOLLER ET AL, "First-order approximation of Gram-Schmidt orthonormalization beats deflation in coupled PCA learning rules", NEUROCOMPUTING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 69, no. 13-15, ISSN 0925-2312, (20060801), pages 1582 - 1590, (20060801), XP027970405 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2013109758 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & US 2013/0142422 A1 entire text *; | [A] - OSAMU SUDO et al., "Segmentation of Color Images Using Texture Features and Fuzzy Region Growing Algorithm", ITE Technical Report Human Information Media Kogaku Eizo Hyogen & Computer Graphics, (20040203), vol. 28, no. 7, ISSN 1342-6893, pages 89 - 94, XP009502895 [A] 1-7 * , particularly, chapter 6 * |