|
21.07.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
08.04.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.03.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.03.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.08.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
26.05.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
27 |