Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10794525 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2016146392 | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462083018 | 21.11.2014 | US201514948020 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107002932 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462083018 | 21.11.2014 | WO2015US61971 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3224520 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2020 | B1 | EP3224520 | 11.07.2018 | A4 | EP3224520 | 04.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462083018 | 21.11.2014 | WO2015US61971 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017010565 | 14.02.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462083018 | 21.11.2014 | WO2015US61971 | 20.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016081893 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462083018 | 21.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201619539 | 01.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462083018 | 21.11.2014 |