EP3221614 - VEHICLE FINAL DRIVE UNIT (FDU) WITH WET CLUTCH(ES) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN Driveline North America, Inc. 2200 North Opdyke Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2368 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEURA, Brent M. 34137 State Street Farmington, MI 48335 / US | 02 /
SPURLOCK, David D. 5625 N. Rainbow Lane Waterford, MI 48329 / US | 03 /
NICKLICH, Stefan 8098 Tadlock Trail Denver, NC 28037 / US | 04 /
GENWAY-HADEN, Robert 2200 N. Opdyke Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | 05 /
YANG, Lei 29785 Lilley Trail Troy, MI 48377 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Neumann Müller Oberwalleney Patentanwälte PartG mbB Overstolzenstraße 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstraße 2a 50677 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15860576.6 | 20.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61885 | Priority number, date | US201462082535P | 20.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462082535 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081845 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221614 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221614 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H37/08, B60K17/02 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F16H48/22 (EP,CN,US);
F16H37/08 (US);
B60K17/02 (US);
B60K23/08 (EP,US);
F16D13/52 (EP);
F16D13/74 (EP);
F16H48/34 (EP,CN,US);
F16H57/0457 (EP,CN,US);
F16H57/0473 (EP,CN,US);
F16H57/0483 (EP,CN,US);
B60K2023/0825 (EP,US);
B60K2023/0833 (EP,US);
B60K2023/0858 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/4244 (EP,US);
F16D2023/123 (EP);
F16H2048/343 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDANTRIEBSEINHEIT (FDU) EINES FAHRZEUGS MIT NASSKUPPLUNG(EN) | [2017/39] | English: | VEHICLE FINAL DRIVE UNIT (FDU) WITH WET CLUTCH(ES) | [2017/39] | French: | MODULE RÉDUCTEUR (FDU) DE VÉHICULE COMPORTANT UN (OU DES) EMBRAYAGE(S) À BAIN D'HUILE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 19.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2015 | AL | 29.01.2020 | CY | 29.01.2020 | CZ | 29.01.2020 | DK | 29.01.2020 | EE | 29.01.2020 | ES | 29.01.2020 | FI | 29.01.2020 | HR | 29.01.2020 | IT | 29.01.2020 | LT | 29.01.2020 | LV | 29.01.2020 | MC | 29.01.2020 | MK | 29.01.2020 | MT | 29.01.2020 | NL | 29.01.2020 | RO | 29.01.2020 | RS | 29.01.2020 | SE | 29.01.2020 | SI | 29.01.2020 | SK | 29.01.2020 | SM | 29.01.2020 | TR | 29.01.2020 | BG | 29.04.2020 | NO | 29.04.2020 | GR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 29.05.2020 | PT | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
AL | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.11.2015 | |
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RO | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
FI | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
NL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 29.01.2020 | |
NO | 29.04.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2416036 (GETRAG ALL WHEEL DRIVE AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figure - *; | [A]DE102010039447 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-15* figures 1,14-18 *; | [A]DE102012219182 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0050]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]US3047115 (LEE ARTHUR L, et al) [A] 1-19 * See column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 41; and figures 1, 4. *; | [A]US3301359 (COLE CARROLL R, et al) [A] 1-19 * See column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 54; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]JP2003090370 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0022]; and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US2013213757 (YANO KEITA [JP], et al) [A] 1-19* See paragraphs [0039]-[0054]; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2014021005 (GREISS BERND [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0031]; and figures 1-5. * |