EP3123926 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/05] | IMAGING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND OPERATION METHOD FOR IMAGING DEVICE | ||
[2019/18] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Tatsuhiko c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
IWASAKI Tomoki c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
HASHIMOTO Susumu c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
HAMADA Toshihiro c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 05 /
KUTSUMA Yuji c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15860784.6 | 16.11.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015JP82132 | Priority number, date | JP20140236899 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014236899 | [2017/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016080351 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123926 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/05, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, // A61B1/06, A61B1/12 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61B1/00009 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,US);
A61B1/00 (US);
A61B1/00181 (EP,US);
A61B1/00188 (EP,US);
A61B1/051 (EP,US);
A61B1/0625 (EP,US);
A61B1/0655 (EP,US);
G02B23/24 (US);
G03B5/00 (US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/555 (EP,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
A61B1/00091 (EP,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,US);
A61B1/0615 (EP,US);
A61B1/126 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/51] | A61B1/00, A61B1/05, G02B23/24, G03B5/00, H04N5/225, H04N5/232, // A61B1/06, A61B1/12 | ||
Former IPC [2017/05] | A61B1/04, A61B1/00, G02B23/24, G03B5/00, H04N5/225, H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/18] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE | [2019/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2019/18] |
Former [2017/05] | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2017/05] | IMAGING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, AND OPERATION METHOD FOR IMAGING DEVICE | ||
Former [2017/05] | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2016 | Translation filed | 26.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 26.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004218060 (EGASHIRA YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] , [0037] * * figures 8,6A-D * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]WO2014088076 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,4 * figure 2A *; | [X]US2014307072 (TAKAHASHI JUMPEI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0068] , [ 0078] , [ 0088] * * figures 1, 5, 8A-E *; | [P]EP2929830 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [P] * figure 2A * | International search | [A]WO2011055614 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * , & JP 4884567 B2 & US 2011/0275889 A1 & EP 2497406 A1 & CN 102469930 A *; | [A]WO2014088076 (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * , & JP 5698879 B2 & US 2015/0265136 A1 & EP 2929830 A1 & CN 104853665 A *; | [EA]JP2015205126 (FUJIFILM CORP) [EA] 1-8 * , (Family: none) *; | [EA]JP2015205127 (FUJIFILM CORP) [EA] 1-8* , (Family: none) * |