EP3210365 - METHODS FOR PACKET-BASED COMMUNICATIONS USING THE INTERNET PROTOCOL, AS WELL AS CORRESPONDING SOURCE NODE AND CORRESPONDING TRANSIT NETWORK NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/35] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FLOW-BASED ADDRESSING IN A MOBILE ENVIRONMENT | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAGE, William Anthony 15 Buttonwood Trail Stittsville, Ontario K2S 1C9 / CA | [2017/35] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/35] | Application number, filing date | 15861050.1 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/35] | WO2015CN94806 | Priority number, date | US201462081383P | 18.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462081383 P | US201514843277 | 02.09.2015 Original published format: US201514843277 | [2017/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016078570 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3210365 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3210365 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12, H04W4/00, H04L12/741 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
H04L45/74 (EP,KR,US);
H04L47/18 (KR,US);
H04L47/2483 (KR,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04L2101/604 (EP,US);
H04L2101/622 (EP,US);
H04L2101/659 (EP,US);
H04L61/5007 (EP,US);
H04L61/5092 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/35] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PAKETBASIERTEN KOMMUNIKATION UNTER VERWENDUNG DES INTERNETPROTOKOLLS SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDER QUELLKNOTEN UND ENTSPRECHENDER TRANSITNETZKNOTEN | [2021/01] | English: | METHODS FOR PACKET-BASED COMMUNICATIONS USING THE INTERNET PROTOCOL, AS WELL AS CORRESPONDING SOURCE NODE AND CORRESPONDING TRANSIT NETWORK NODE | [2021/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION PAR PAQUETS UTILISANT LE PROTOCOLE INTERNET, AINSI QUE NOEUD SOURCE ET NOEUD DE RÉSEAU DE TRANSIT CORRESPONDANTS | [2021/01] |
Former [2017/35] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR FLUSSBASIERTE ADRESSIERUNG IN EINER MOBILEN UMGEBUNG | ||
Former [2017/35] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR FLOW-BASED ADDRESSING IN A MOBILE ENVIRONMENT | ||
Former [2017/35] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADRESSAGE À BASE DE FLUX DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 25.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2015 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | ES | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | IT | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | MT | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | TR | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | GB | 17.11.2021 | IE | 17.11.2021 | LU | 17.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | CH | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | LI | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
TR | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 17.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 17.11.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
GB | 17.11.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
CH | 30.11.2021 | ||
LI | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
IT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
LU | 17.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
ES | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011274042 (DIACHINA JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0052] - [0053] *; | [X]US2013142118 (CHERIAN GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0106] *; | [X]US2014003357 (EJZAK RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0097]; claim 1 *; | [A] - HINDEN NOKIA S DEERING CISCO SYSTEMS R, "IP Version 6 Addressing Architecture; rfc4291.txt", NETWORK WORKING GROUP RFC 1717, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, CH, (20060201), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015054931 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2007086486 (PARK MI R [KR], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101047614 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009103541 (LIN YANGBO [CN]) [A] 1-30* the whole document * |