EP3221859 - POST MORTEM RECONSTITUTION OF CIRCULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maximum Fidelity Surgical Simulations, LLC 1605 E. Broadway Suite 300 Columbia, MO 65201 / US | [2020/43] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Maximum Fidelity Surgical Simulations, LLC 1605 E. Broadway Suite 300 Columbia, MO 65201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ, Joss Dean 2600 Snowberry Circle Columbia, MO 65201 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | González Peces, Gustavo Adolfo Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2020/43] | González Peces, Gustavo Adolfo Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2017/39] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15861329.9 | 18.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61399 | Priority number, date | US201462081462P | 18.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462081462 P | US201562157654P | 06.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562157654 P | US201562195672P | 22.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562195672 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081637 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221859 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221859 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G09B23/30, A01N1/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G09B23/303 (EP,US);
A01N1/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/39] | G09B23/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSTMORTALE ZIRKULATIONSREKONSTITUTION | [2017/39] | English: | POST MORTEM RECONSTITUTION OF CIRCULATION | [2017/39] | French: | RECONSTITUTION DE LA CIRCULATION POST-MORTEM | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2015 | AL | 21.10.2020 | AT | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | DK | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | FI | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | NL | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SE | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | TR | 21.10.2020 | LU | 18.11.2020 | CH | 30.11.2020 | LI | 30.11.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | NO | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.11.2015 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
TR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
AT | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
DK | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
CH | 30.11.2020 | ||
LI | 30.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
LU | 18.11.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 21.10.2020 | |
FI | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SE | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
NO | 21.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 21.10.2020 | |
NL | 21.10.2020 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 21.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6191193 (LEE CHUL-JOO [KR], et al); | [Y]US6824389 (GARRETT JR H EDWARD [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US2003186203 (ABOUD EMAD T [SY]); | [Y]US2003206884 (BARROW DERMOT CHRISTOPHER JOHN [GB]); | [XY]US6824389 (GARRETT JR H EDWARD [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006124021 (ANGIOTECH INT AG [CH], et al); | [Y]WO2011126801 (CONNALLY CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2014270738 (LYNCH MICHAEL DEAN [US]) | by applicant | US5679333 | US6191193 | US6824389 |