EP3220908 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ENDOMETRIOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of South Florida 3802 Spectrum Blvd. Suite 100 Tampa, FL 33612 / US | For all designated states Ponce Health Sciences University P.O. Box 7004 Ponce 00732 / PR | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANJUNDAN, Meera 5125 Palm Springs Blvd. 13-307 Tampa, FL 33647 / US | 02 /
BAUCKMAN, Kyle A. 1046 Kuhlman Lane St. Louis, MO 63115 / US | 03 /
FLORES, Idhaliz 3336 Calle Dona Juana Vista Point Ponce Puerto Rico 00716 / US | [2022/27] |
Former [2017/39] | 01 /
NANJUNDAN, Meera 5125 Palm Springs Blvd. 13-307 Tampa, FL 33647 / US | ||
02 /
BAUCKMAN, Kyle A. 1046 Kuhlman Ln. St. Louis, MO 63115 / US | |||
03 /
FLORES, Idhaliz 3336 Calle Dona Juana Vista Point Ponce Puerto Rico 00716 / US | Representative(s) | Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Williams Powell 5 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1LG / GB | ||
Former [2017/39] | Williams Powell 11 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15861702.7 | 18.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61393 | Priority number, date | US201462081464P | 18.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462081464 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081634 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3220908 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3220908 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/33, A61K31/4706, A61K35/48, A61K31/4709, A61K31/7105, C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6886, G01N33/68, A61P15/00 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/4706 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/7105 (EP,US);
A61K35/48 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
G01N33/689 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (US);
C12N2320/31 (US);
C12N2320/32 (US);
C12N2320/35 (US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2018/26] | A61K31/33, A61K31/4706, A61K35/48, A61K31/4709, A61K31/7105, C12Q1/6883, C12Q1/6886, G01N33/68 | ||
Former IPC [2017/39] | A61K31/33, A61K31/4706 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENDOMETRIOSE | [2017/39] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING ENDOMETRIOSIS | [2017/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE L'ENDOMÉTRIOSE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 05.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | CY | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | MK | 06.07.2022 | MT | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
MK | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
CY | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
MC | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | EE | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 06.07.2022 | |
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | LT | 06.07.2022 | |
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 06.07.2022 | |
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 06.07.2022 | |
RS | 06.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0047739 (DADE BEHRING INC [US]) [X] 13 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]US6572858 (CHAROUS B LAUREN [US]) [X] 2-7 * column 5, paragraph 2; claims 1-9 * * column 11, lines 9-12 *; | [X] - Kyle Bauckman ET AL, "Characterization of Iron Response in Gynecological Cell Lines", GRADUATE THESES AND DISSERTATIONS, ProQuest Dissertations Publishing, (20140501), pages 1 - 176, XP055445602 [X] 8,14,15 * page 50; figures 9,10 * | [IP] - FUKUDA TOMOHIKO ET AL, "The anti-malarial chloroquine suppresses proliferation and overcomes cisplatin resistance of endometrial cancer cells via autophagy inhibition", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, (20150601), vol. 137, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.YGYNO.2015.03.053, ISSN 0090-8258, pages 538 - 545, XP029240774 [IP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygyno.2015.03.053 | [IP] - A RUIZ ET AL, "Effect of hydroxychloroquine and characterization of autophagy in a mouse model of endometriosis", CELL DEATH & DISEASE, GB, (20160101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1038/cddis.2015.361, ISSN 2041-4889, pages e2059 - 1, XP055474876 [IP] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cddis.2015.361 | International search | [Y]US2009238876 (DANENBERG HAIM [IL], et al) [Y] 7, 10/7, 11/7* ; paragraphs [0005], [0034]. *; | [Y]US2011318335 (NEWELL MARTHA KAREN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/1-3, 9, 10/6-9, 11/9, 12-14, 15/12-14, 16/12-14, 17, 18, 19/17-18, 20/17-18, 21/17-18 * ; paragraphs [0012], [0013], [0030], [0033], [0034], [0050], [0053], [0054], [0060], [0117], [0160], [0162]-[0164], [0167], [0168], [0177], [0187]-[0189], [0190]. *; | [XY] - BAUCKMAN, K., "Characterization Of Iron Response In Gynecological Cell Lines.", Graduate Theses and Dissertations., (20140500), page iv-161, XP055445602 [X] 6, 8, 11/6, 11/8 * ; figure 8; page ix, first paragraph; page 4, third paragraph; page 7, first paragraph; page 28, paragraph continued from page 26; page 49, first paragraph; page 51, first paragraph; page 52, second paragraph; page 53, paragraph continued from page 52. * [Y] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/1-3, 7, 9, 10/6-9, 11/7, 11/9, 12-14, 15/12-14, 16/12-14, 17, 18, 19/17-18, 20/17-18, 21/17-18 | Examination | - P. A.B. KLEMMT ET AL, "Endometrial cells from women with endometriosis have increased adhesion and proliferative capacity in response to extracellular matrix components: towards a mechanistic model for endometriosis progression", HUMAN REPRODUCTION, GB, (20071018), vol. 22, no. 12, doi:10.1093/humrep/dem262, ISSN 0268-1161, pages 3139 - 3147, XP055609990 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/dem262 | - Denise K. Marciano ET AL, "Methods for Identifying Novel Integrin Ligands", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, US, ACADEMIC PRESS, (20070101), vol. 426, pages 223 - 237, doi:10.1016/S0076-6879(07)26011-2, ISSN 0076-6879, XP055610067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(07)26011-2 | by applicant | WO0047739 | US6572858 | US2009238876 | - FUKUDA, Gynecologic Oncology, (20150000), vol. 137, pages 538 - 545 | - RUIZ et al., Cell Death and Disease, (20160000), vol. 7, page e2059 | - MARINO GURIA JAPUENTE XSQUESADA VBORDALLO JLOPEZ-OTIN C, "Human autophagins, a family of cysteine proteinases potentially implicated in cell degradation by autophagy", J Biol Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, doi:10.1074/jbc.M208247200, pages 3671 - 3678, XP055158977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M208247200 | - JANSSEN NMGENTA MS, "The effects of immunosuppressive and anti-inflammatory medications on fertility, pregnancy, and lactation", Arch Intern Med, (20000000), vol. 160, pages 610 - 619 | - STRIETER RMKUNKEL SLARENBERG DABURDICK MDPOLVERINI PJ, "Interferon gamma-inducible protein 10 (IP-10), a member of the C-X-C chemokine family, is an inhibitor of angiogenesis", Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (19950000), vol. 210, pages 51 - 57 | - GIUDICE LCKAO LC, "Endometriosis", Lancet, (20040000), vol. 364, pages 1789 - 1799 | - BULUN SE, "Endometriosis", N Engl J Med, (20090000), vol. 360, pages 268 - 279 | - GIUDICE LC, "Clinical practice. Endometriosis", N Engl J Med, (20100000), vol. 362, pages 2389 - 2398 | - SOURIAL STEMPEST NHAPANGAMA DK, "Theories on the pathogenesis of endometriosis", Int J Reprod Med, (20140000), vol. 2014, page 179515 | - SAMPSON JA, "Peritoneal endometriosis due to the menstrual dissemination of endometrial tissue into the peritoneal cavity", American Journal of Obstetrics and Gynecology, (19270000), vol. 14, pages 422 - 469 | - BALDI ACAMPIONI MSIGNORILE PG, "Endometriosis: pathogenesis, diagnosis, therapy and association with cancer", Oncol Rep, (20080000), vol. 19, doi:10.3892/or.19.4.843, pages 843 - 846, XP055026715 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/or.19.4.843 | - VERCELLINI PVIGANO PSOMIGLIANA EFEDELE L, "Endometriosis: pathogenesis and treatment", Nat Rev Endocrinol, (20140000), vol. 10, pages 261 - 275 | - FUNG CLOCK RGAO SSALAS EDEBNATH J, "Induction of autophagy during extracellular matrix detachment promotes cell survival", Mol Biol Cell, (20080000), vol. 19, pages 797 - 806 | - LAMB CAYOSHIMORI TTOOZE SA, "The autophagosome: origins unknown, biogenesis complex", Nat Rev Mol Cell Biol, (20130000), vol. 14, pages 759 - 774 | - FENG YHE DYAO ZKLIONSKY DJ, "The machinery of macroautophagy", Cell Res, (20140000), vol. 24, pages 24 - 41 | - LEGAKIS JEYEN WLKLIONSKY DJ, "A cycling protein complex required for selective autophagy", Autophagy, (20070000), vol. 3, pages 422 - 432 | - PELCH KESCHRODER ALKIMBALL PASHARPE-TIMMS KLDAVIS JWNAGEL SC, "Aberrant gene expression profile in a mouse model of endometriosis mirrors that observed in women", Fertil Steril, (20100000), vol. 93, pages 1615 - 1627 | - CHOI JJO MLEE EKIM HJCHOI D, "Differential induction of autophagy by mTOR is associated with abnormal apoptosis in ovarian endometriotic cysts", Mol Hum Reprod, (20140000), vol. 20, pages 309 - 317 | - ALLAVENA GCARRARELLI PDEL BELLO BLUISI SPETRAGLIA FMAELLARO E, "Autophagy is upregulated in ovarian endometriosis: a possible interplay with p53 and heme oxygenase-1", Fertil Steril, (20150000), vol. 103, pages 1244 - 1251 | - AL-BARI MA, "Chloroquine analogues in drug discovery: new directions of uses, mechanisms of actions and toxic manifestations from malaria to multifarious diseases", J Antimicrob Chemother, (20150000), vol. 70, pages 1608 - 1621 | - AMARAVADI RKLIPPINCOTT-SCHWARTZ JYIN XMWEISS WATAKEBE NTIMMER W, "Principles and current strategies for targeting autophagy for cancer treatment", Clin Cancer Res, (20110000), vol. 17, pages 654 - 666 | - CALABRETTA BSALOMONI P, "Inhibition of autophagy: a new strategy to enhance sensitivity of chronic myeloid leukemia stem cells to tyrosine kinase inhibitors", Leuk Lymphoma, (20110000), vol. 1, doi:10.3109/10428194.2010.546913, pages 54 - 59, XP009501198 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10428194.2010.546913 | - BAUCKMAN KAHALLER EFLORES INANJUNDAN M, "Iron modulates cell survival in a Ras-and MAPK-dependent manner in ovarian cells", Cell Death Dis, (20130000), vol. 4, page e592 | - SOMIGLIANA EVIGANO PROSSI GCARINELLI SVIGNALI MPANINA-BORDIGNON P, "Endometrial ability to implant in ectopic sites can be prevented by interleukin-12 in a murine model of endometriosis", Hum Reprod, (19990000), vol. 14, pages 2944 - 2950 | - MARIANI MVIGANO PGENTILINI DCAMISA BCAPORIZZO EDI LUCIA P, "The selective vitamin D receptor agonist, elocalcitol, reduces endometriosis development in a mouse model by inhibiting peritoneal inflammation", Hum Reprod, (20120000), vol. 27, pages 2010 - 2019 | - MCAFEE QZHANG ZSAMANTA ALEVI SMMA XHPIAO S, "Autophagy inhibitor Lys05 has single-agent antitumor activity and reproduces the phenotype of a genetic autophagy deficiency", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20120000), vol. 109, doi:10.1073/pnas.1118193109, pages 8253 - 8258, XP055166131 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1118193109 | - BACCI MCAPOBIANCO AMONNO ACOTTONE LDI PUPPO FCAMISA B, "Macrophages are alternatively activated in patients with endometriosis and required for growth and vascularization of lesions in a mouse model of disease", Am J Pathol, (20090000), vol. 175, pages 547 - 556 | - JANG CHCHOI JHBYUN MSJUE DM, "Chloroquine inhibits production of TNF-alpha, IL-1beta and IL-6 from lipopolysaccharide-stimulated human monocytes/macrophages by different modes", Rheumatology (Oxford), (20060000), vol. 45, pages 703 - 710 | - DINULESCU DMINCE TAQUADE BJSHAFER SACROWLEY DJACKS T, "Role of K-ras and Pten in the development of mouse models of endometriosis and endometrioid ovarian cancer", Nat Med, (20050000), vol. 11, doi:10.1038/nm1173, pages 63 - 70, XP002506011 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1173 | - MATSUZAKI SCANIS MPOULY JLBOTCHORISHVILI RDECHELOTTE PJMAGE G, "Differential expression of genes in eutopic and ectopic endometrium from patients with ovarian endometriosis", Fertil Steril, (20060000), vol. 86, doi:10.1016/j.fertnstert.2006.02.093, pages 548 - 553, XP028063664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2006.02.093 | - MEOLA JROSA E SILVA JCDENTILLO DBDA SILVA WA, JR.VEIGA-CASTELLI LCBERNARDES LA, "Differentially expressed genes in eutopic and ectopic endometrium of women with endometriosis", Fertil Steril, (20100000), vol. 93, pages 1750 - 1773 | - KLIONSKY DJABDALLA FCABELIOVICH HABRAHAM RTACEVEDO-AROZENA AADELI K et al., "Guidelines for the use and interpretation of assays for monitoring autophagy", Autophagy, (20120000), vol. 8, doi:10.4161/auto.19496, pages 445 - 544, XP009185550 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/auto.19496 | - COLON-DIAZ MBAEZ-VEGA PGARCIA MRUIZ AMONTEIRO JBFOURQUET J et al., "HDAC1 andHDAC2 are differentially expressed in endometriosis", Reprod Sci., (20120000), vol. 19, pages 483 - 492 | - LEE SJSILVERMAN EBARGMAN JM, "The role of antimalarial agents in the treatment of SLE and lupus nephritis", Nat Rev Nephrol, (20110000), vol. 7, pages 718 - 729 | - NOTHNICK WB, "Treating endometriosis as an autoimmune disease", Fertil Steril, (20010000), vol. 76, pages 223 - 231 | - NIRGIANAKIS KBERSINGER NAMCKINNON BKOSTOV PIMBODEN SMUELLER MD, "Regression of the inflammatory microenvironment of the peritoneal cavity in women with endometriosis by GnRHa treatment", Eur J Obstet Gynecol Reprod Biol, (20130000), vol. 170, pages 550 - 554 | - SINAII NCLEARY SDBALLWEG MLNIEMAN LKSTRATTON P, "High rates of autoimmune and endocrine disorders, fibromyalgia, chronic fatigue syndrome and atopic diseases among women with endometriosis: a survey analysis", Hum Reprod, (20020000), vol. 17, pages 2715 - 2724 | - KVASKOFF MMU FTERRY KLHARRIS HRPOOLE EMFARLAND L et al., "Endometriosis: a high-risk population for major chronic diseases?", Hum Reprod Update, (20150000), vol. 21, doi:10.1093/humupd/dmv013, pages 500 - 516, XP002765716 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humupd/dmv013 | - BEN-ZVI IKIVITY SLANGEVITZ PSHOENFELD Y, "Hydroxychloroquine: from malaria to autoimmunity", Clin Rev Allergy Immunol, (20120000), vol. 42, doi:10.1007/s12016-010-8243-x, pages 145 - 153, XP037068774 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12016-010-8243-x | - VON ADAMEK EVSIMOES MJFREITAS VPATRIARCA MTSOARES JM, JR.BARACAT EC, "Lysosomal evaluation of endometrioma capsule epithelium and endometrium of patients with or without endometriosis", Clin Exp Obstet Gynecol, (20050000), vol. 32, pages 27 - 30 | - LEE IHKAWAI YFERGUSSON MMROVIRA, IIBISHOP AJMOTOYAMA N et al., "Atg7 modulates p53 activity to regulate cell cycle and survival during metabolic stress", Science, (20120000), vol. 336, pages 225 - 228 | - TAUB DDLLOYD ARCONLON KWANG JMORTALDO JRHARADA A et al., "Recombinant human interferon-inducible protein 10 is a chemoattractant for human monocytes and T lymphocytes and promotes T cell adhesion to endothelial cells", J Exp Med, (19930000), vol. 177, doi:10.1084/jem.177.6.1809, pages 1809 - 1814, XP000645461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.177.6.1809 | - GALLERI LLUISI SROTONDI MROMAGNANI PCOBELLIS LSERIO M et al., "Low serum and peritoneal fluid concentration of interferon-gamma-induced protein-10 (CXCL10) in women with endometriosis", Fertil Steril, (20090000), vol. 91, pages 331 - 334 | - BURNEY ROTALBI SHAMILTON AEVO KCNYEGAARD MNEZHAT CR et al., "Gene expression analysis of endometrium reveals progesterone resistance and candidate susceptibility genes in women with endometriosis", Endocrinology, (20070000), vol. 148, doi:10.1210/en.2006-1692, pages 3814 - 3826, XP008142244 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2006-1692 | - GENG JKLIONSKY DJ, "The Atg8 and Atg12 ubiquitin-like conjugation systems in macroautophagy. 'Protein modifications: beyond the usual suspects' review series", EMBO Rep, (20080000), vol. 9, pages 859 - 864 | - LI MHOU YWANG JCHEN XSHAO ZMYIN XM, "Kinetics comparisons of mammalian Atg4 homologues indicate selective preferences toward diverse Atg8 substrates", J Biol Chem, (20110000), vol. 286, doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.199059, pages 7327 - 7338, XP055252060 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.199059 | - WORDINGER RJDICKEY JFELLICOTT AR, "Histochemical evaluation of the lipid droplet content of bovine oviductal and endometrial epithelial cells", J Reprod Fertil, (19770000), vol. 49, pages 113 - 114 | - SHIBATA MYOSHIMURA KTAMURA HUENO TNISHIMURA TINOUE T, "LC3, a microtubule- associated protein1A/B light chain3, is involved in cytoplasmic lipid droplet formation", Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20100000), vol. 393, doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2010.01.121, pages 274 - 279, XP026943284 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2010.01.121 | - TAYLOR EWILLIAMS C, "Surgical treatment of endometriosis: location and patterns of disease at reoperation", Fertil Steril, (20100000), vol. 93, pages 57 - 61 | - LAUX-BIEHLMANN AD'HOOGHE TZOLLNER TM, "Menstruation pulls the trigger for inflammation and pain in endometriosis", Trends Pharmacol Sci, (20150000), vol. 36, doi:10.1016/j.tips.2015.03.004, pages 270 - 276, XP055557000 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tips.2015.03.004 | - HADFIELD RMARDON HBARLOW DKENNEDY S, "Delay in the diagnosis of endometriosis: a survey of women from the USA and the UK", Hum Reprod, (19960000), vol. 11, pages 878 - 880 | - BILOTAS MAOLIVARES CNRICCI AGBASTON JIBENGOCHEA TSMERESMAN GF, "Interplay between Endometriosis and Pregnancy in a Mouse Model", PLoS One, (20150000), vol. 10, page e0124900 | - PERECKO TKASSAB RBVASICEK OPEKAROVA MJANCINOVA VLOJEK A, "The effects of chloroquine and hydroxychloroquine on nitric oxide production in RAW 264.7 and bone marrow- derived macrophages", Folia Biol (Praha), (20140000), vol. 1, pages 39 - 44 | - SMITH DMPATEL SRAFFOUL FHALLER EMILLS GBNANJUNDAN M, "Arsenic trioxide induces a beclin-1-independent autophagic pathway via modulation of SnoN/SkiL expression in ovarian carcinoma cells", Cell Death Differ, (20100000), vol. 17, pages 1867 - 1881 |