EP3222895 - CONE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JINNO, Hiroki c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 02 /
GOTOU, Tetsurou c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Tsuyoshi c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 04 /
KITAZAKI, Tooru c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3 Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 15861728.2 | 01.07.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015JP69024 | Priority number, date | JP20140236461 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014236461 | JP20150003105 | 09.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015003105 | [2017/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016080013 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222895 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/06, C22B23/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
F16K15/063 (EP,US);
F16K1/385 (EP,US);
C22B23/0415 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | KEGELVENTIL | [2017/39] | English: | CONE VALVE | [2017/39] | French: | CLAPET CONIQUE | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2017 | Translation filed | 11.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 21.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2213104 (SKM) [X] 1-3* page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph L; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPH11280927 (CKD CORP) [A] 1-3 * , abstract; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0185409U (Kawasaki Heavy Industries, Ltd.) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5264903U (Hiroshi KAZAMA) [A] 1-3 * , page 1, line 8 to page 4, line 8; fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS62115571U (Mitsubishi Metal Corp.) [A] 1-3 * , page 1, line 16 to page 3, line 12; fig. 3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014205901 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [A] 1-3 * , abstract; paragraph [0053] & WO 2014/148097 A1 * |