EP3222884 - GEAR AND ELECTRIC ACTUATOR PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEDA, Yoshinori c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
MIKURIYA, Isao c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 03 /
KAWAGUCHI, Hayato c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 15861802.5 | 20.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015JP82673 | Priority number, date | JP20140236133 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014236133 | [2017/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016080513 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3222884 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16H55/14, F16H25/20, F16H25/22, // B23P15/14 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
F16H55/14 (EP,US);
B21D53/28 (US);
B23P15/14 (US);
F16H1/00 (US);
F16H25/2204 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/39] | F16H55/14, F16H25/20, F16H25/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | GETRIEBE UND ELEKTRISCHER AKTUATOR DAMIT | [2017/39] | English: | GEAR AND ELECTRIC ACTUATOR PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2017/39] | French: | ENGRENAGE ET ACTIONNEUR ÉLECTRIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2017 | Translation filed | 14.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 28.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS56153659U (FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.) [X] 1-4 * figures 1, 2 *[I] 5; | [XYI]JPS5830066U (SONY CO) [X] 1-4 * figures 4, 5 * * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 6 [I] 5; | [A]DE9313547U (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 5 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 27 - line 29 *; | [Y]WO2014069516 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0023] * | International search | [Y]JPS55161952U (Jidosha Buhin Seizo Kabushiki Kaisha) [Y] 2, 6 * , fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JPS56153659U (Fuji Heavy Industries Ltd.) [X] 1, 3-5 * , fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 6; | [A]JPH03110251U (Nissan Diesel Motor Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-6* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2013148108 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 6 * , fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * |