Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107078634B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | B | CN107078634 | 18.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414548106 | 19.11.2014 | WO2015CN94944 | 18.11.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3108575 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2021 | B1 | EP3108575 | 05.04.2017 | A4 | EP3108575 | 28.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414548106 | 19.11.2014 | WO2015CN94944 | 18.11.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016078590 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414548106 | 19.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9812968 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2016141960 | 19.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414548106 | 19.11.2014 |