EP3221366 - POLYAMINOMETHYLBENZYLOXALAMIDES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED THERETO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastipak Packaging, Inc. 41605 Ann Arbor Road Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2017/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Shenshen 600 Thames Parkway Apartment 2F Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2017/39] | Golding, Louise Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15861861.1 | 17.11.2015 | [2017/39] | WO2015US61154 | Priority number, date | US201462081547P | 18.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462081547 P | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016081501 | Date: | 26.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3221366 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3221366 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/30, C08G69/26 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08G69/26 (EP,US);
C08K5/0091 (EP,US);
C08L77/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08K5/0091, C08L77/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/39] | C08F8/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYAMINOMETHYLBENZYLOXALAMIDE SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2017/39] | English: | POLYAMINOMETHYLBENZYLOXALAMIDES AND COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED THERETO | [2017/39] | French: | POLYAMINOMÉTHYLBENZYLOXALAMIDES ET COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2017/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 06.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2024
07.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2024/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.03.2024
07.03.2024
ADMISSIBLE Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 22.03.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.07.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.01.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | LU | 17.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5034252 (NILSSON TORSTEN [SE], et al); | [X]EP2444458 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | International search | [A]US5021515 (COCHRAN MICHAEL A [GB], et al) [A] 1-16* ; entire document *; | [Y]US5034252 (NILSSON TORSTEN [SE], et al) [Y] 1-5, 14-15 * ; col 2, In 64 - col 3, In 2, col 4, In 51-52; col 5, In 8 *; | [XY]US5093466 (PATTON TAD L [US], et al) [X] 6-8, 10, 12-13, 16 * ; col 4, In 17; col 5, In 1-2; col 6 In 50 -54 * [Y] 1-5, 9, 11, 14-15; | [Y]US5391640 (AKKAPEDDI MURALI K [US], et al) [Y] 11 * ; col 7, In 38 *; | [A]US6506463 (CAHILL PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * ; entire document *; | [A]US7288586 (STEWART MARK EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US8684187 (BUSCHMANN WAYNE E [US]) [Y] 9 * ; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5021515 | US5955527 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Technology, Wiley Interscience, (19850000), vol. 2, page 178 | Opposition | WO2006062749 | WO2006063032 | JP2010099875 | EP2463341 | EP3009375 |