15.11.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] |
18.10.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2024 [2024/47] |
11.10.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2024 [2024/46] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
03.05.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
16.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
24.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
26.05.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
22.05.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.05.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.03.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
12.01.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2021 |
Deletion: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.07.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.07.2021 |
First examination report |
|
16.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
29.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
02.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.06.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
29.06.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
02.02.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.01.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
26.01.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
09.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
27.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|