06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
19.08.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
10.09.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.10.2021 [2021/41] |
03.09.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.09.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.09.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.05.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
Change - English title |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
20.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.05.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.05.2020 |
First examination report |
|
19.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.05.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
25.05.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
02.02.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
02.02.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
25.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.09.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
09.08.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
28.04.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|