Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10195626 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | B2 | US2017348716 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014242333 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP05627 | 11.11.2015 | JP2014241857 | 28.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6404100B | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B2 | JP2016101568 | 02.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014242333 | 28.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6385810B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2018 | B2 | JP2015199055 | 12.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014241857 | 28.11.2014 | JP2014073971 | 31.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107107085B | Global Dossier | 19.04.2019 | B | CN107107085 | 29.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014242333 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP05627 | 11.11.2015 | JP2014241857 | 28.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3225314 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2021 | B1 | EP3225314 | 27.06.2018 | A4 | EP3225314 | 04.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014242333 | 28.11.2014 | WO2015JP05627 | 11.11.2015 | JP2014241857 | 28.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016084320 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014242333 | 28.11.2014 | JP2014241857 | 28.11.2014 |