EP3224647 - CONROLLLING RADAR TRANSMISSION TO ENABLE INTERFERENCE MITIGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated PO Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 12500 TI Boulevard Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Sandeep 129 Maple A Prestige Greenwood Apts. 8/9 Nagavarpalya Main Road C.V. Raman Nagar Bangalore 93 / IN | 02 /
SUBBURAJ, Karthik 161 18th main BTM-2nd stage Bangalore 560076 / IN | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH EMEA Patent Department Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15862718.2 | 24.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015US62466 | Priority number, date | US201414552505 | 25.11.2014 Original published format: US201414552505 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016086007 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224647 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/34, G01S7/35 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S13/38 (US);
G01S13/583 (US);
G01S7/28 (US);
G01S7/354 (EP,US);
G01S13/343 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | G01S13/56, G01S7/41 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG VON RADARÜBERTRAGUNG ZUR INTERFERENZABSCHWÄCHUNG | [2017/40] | English: | CONROLLLING RADAR TRANSMISSION TO ENABLE INTERFERENCE MITIGATION | [2017/40] | French: | CONTRÔLE DES ÉMISSIONS RADAR POUR PERMETTRE L'ATTÉNUATION DES INTERFÉRENCES | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 26.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4234882 (THOMPSON LIONEL R F) [X] 1,5,7,14,15 * column 4, line 21 - column 4, line 63; figure 4 *; | [XI]US6646589 (NATSUME KAZUMA [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-14,16,18-20 * column 15, line 15 - column 17, line 61; figures 4-6 * [I] 5,11,15,17; | [X]JP2004085452 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1,7,14 * figures 12, 13 *; | [X]JP2004151022 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1,7,14* figures 1b, 3, 4 *; | [X]US2009121915 (RANDLER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,14 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0045]; figures 6,4,8 *; | [X]DE102009002243 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,7,14 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2011037641 (STEFFENS WOLF [DE]) [X] 1,4,14,17 * paragraph [0037] - paragraphs [0042] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US2011122014 (SZAJNOWSKI WIESLAW JERZY [GB]) [X] 1,7,14 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053]; figures 3a, 4 * | International search | [A]WO2007148199 (TELESPAZIO SPA [IT], et al)[A] 1-20; | [A]EP2500744 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * , abstract, fig. 1, claim 1, paragraphs [0006], [0007], [0010], [0015], [0029], [0033], [0035], [0036], [0048] * |