EP3225616 - ALPHA-ASARY-LALDEHYDE ESTER, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwest University No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an, Shaanxi 710069 / CN | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Xiaohui No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | 02 /
QIN, Fanggang No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | 03 /
BAI, Yajun No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Shixiang No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, Yi No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | 06 /
HE, Xirui No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | 07 /
LIU, Pei No. 229, Taibai North Road Xi'an Shaanxi 710069 / CN | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15863145.7 | 26.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015CN95686 | Priority number, date | CN201410699506 | 26.11.2014 Original published format: CN201410699506 | [2017/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016082780 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3225616 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3225616 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/734, C07C69/732, C07C69/24, C07C69/76, C07C69/007, C07C205/56, C07D213/80, C07D207/16, A61P25/20, A61P25/28, A61P25/08 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
A61P25/08 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07C67/08 (IL,KR,RU,US);
C07C69/734 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07C69/78 (CN,IL,RU,US);
A61K31/216 (IL,KR);
A61K31/40 (IL,RU);
A61K31/4406 (IL,RU);
A61P25/14 (IL,RU);
A61P25/20 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61P25/22 (IL,RU);
A61P25/24 (IL,RU);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07C201/12 (EP,IL,US);
C07C205/56 (CN,IL,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,IL,US);
C07C253/30 (EP,IL,US);
C07C67/48 (IL,KR);
C07C69/007 (EP,IL,US);
C07C69/24 (EP,IL,RU,US);
C07C69/33 (CN,IL,US);
C07C69/614 (IL,RU);
C07C69/732 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
C07C69/76 (EP,IL,US);
C07D207/16 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C201/12, C07C205/49 (US,EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/06 (US,EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/34 (EP,US);
C07C253/30, C07C255/57 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/40] | C07C69/734, C07C69/732, C07C69/33, C07C67/08, C07D213/80, C07D207/16, C07C205/56, C07C201/12, A61P25/20, A61P25/28, A61P25/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALPHA-ASARY-LALDEHYD-ESTER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2017/40] | English: | ALPHA-ASARY-LALDEHYDE ESTER, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2017/40] | French: | ESTER D'ALPHA-ASARYL-ALDÉHYDE, PROCÉDÉ POUR LE PRÉPARER ET SON APPLICATION | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2017 | Translation filed | 13.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 13.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/29] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN102648937 (INST MEDICINAL PLANT DEV CAMS); | International search | [A]CN101215226 (UNIV HUNAN NORMAL [CN]); | [A]CN101974011 (YUNNAN BIOVALLEY DENGZHANHUA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [PX]CN104529775 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN, et al); |