EP3226413 - PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMA, Hiroto c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/40] | Application number, filing date | 15863895.7 | 29.06.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015JP68686 | Priority number, date | JP20140241715 | 28.11.2014 Original published format: JP 2014241715 | [2017/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016084417 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226413 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/05, H03H9/10, H03H3/04, H01G4/40, // H01G4/12 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H01G4/40 (EP,US);
H03H9/17 (US);
H03H3/04 (EP,US);
H03H9/0547 (EP,US);
H03H9/1014 (EP,US);
H01G4/1218 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | H03H9/02, H01G4/12, H01G4/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE KOMPONENTE | [2017/40] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC COMPONENT | [2017/40] | French: | COMPOSANT PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2017 | Translation filed | 03.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 03.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH067316U (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1,3,5,6 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0012]; figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 2,4,7-9; | [A]US5925968 (YACHI MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 53; figures 17 - 19 *; | [I]JP2006270548 (TDK CORP) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2009236941 (NAKAI YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0110]; figures 6 - 11 ** paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0158] *; | [I]JP2014150333 (KYOCERA CORP) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0047]; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JPS6068643 (FUJITSU LTD) [Y] 2-9 * , page 1, lower right column, line 17 to page 2, lower left column, line 9; fig. 3, 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH09307028 (NEC CORP) [Y] 9* , paragraphs [0018] to [0034]; fig. 1, 2 & US 5889232 A & US 5970322 A & EP 807971 A2 *; | [Y]JP2003198304 (DAISHINKU CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0009], [0025] to [0043]; fig. 1 to 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2005210404 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0025] to [0043]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2007096429 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0035]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010245932 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0009] to [0010], [0014] to [0016]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014192802 (NIHON DEMPA KOGYO CO) [Y] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0005], [0036] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * |