EP3224711 - CENTRALIZED CLIENT APPLICATION MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eBay Inc. 2025 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | For all designated states eBay, Inc. 2025 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | ||
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states eBay Inc. 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMP, Roy Leon 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | 02 /
SREEPATHI, Gireesh 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Hui 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, California 95125 / US | 04 /
VAN VOORDEN, Frederik 2145 Hamilton Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | [2017/40] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Collins, John David Schwegman Lundberg Woessner Ltd. Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15864039.1 | 25.11.2015 | [2017/40] | WO2015US62592 | Priority number, date | US201462085136P | 26.11.2014 Original published format: US 201462085136 P | US201514950012 | 24.11.2015 Original published format: US201514950012 | [2017/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016086091 | Date: | 02.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3224711 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/60, G06F8/65, G06F9/445, H04L29/08, H04W4/50 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F9/44505 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (KR,US);
H04W4/50 (KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/40] | G06F9/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] | Title | German: | ZENTRALISIERTE CLIENT-ANWENDUNGSVERWALTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | CENTRALIZED CLIENT APPLICATION MANAGEMENT | [2017/40] | French: | GESTION D'APPLICATION CLIENT CENTRALISÉE | [2017/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2017 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 15.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/29] | 24.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP22177675.0 / EP4075265 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008052395 (WRIGHT MICHAEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2008127190 (SHU QI [CN], et al); | [XY]US7568018 (HOVE JAMES B [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US2012260232 (HIRSCH SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]US8595810 (BEN AYED MOURAD [US]); | [A]US2014020070 (ANGAL RAJEEV [US]); | [A]US8739249 (KAY ERIK [US], et al) |