22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
18.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
24.09.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
03.09.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.10.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.10.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.06.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
02.03.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
02.03.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
08.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.10.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
06.10.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.10.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
11.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
24.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|