Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019075580 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715789747 | 20.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017124181 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662412603 | 25.10.2016 | US201662281890 | 22.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014056066 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012CA00946 | 12.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011123950 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2011 | A8 | WO2011123950 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021023419 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213639446 | 04.10.2012 | US201715666206 | 01.08.2017 | US202016895566 | 08.06.2020 | US201514435084 | 10.04.2015 | WO2015CA51278 | 04.12.2015 | WO2017CA50044 | 13.01.2017 | US201715789747 | 20.10.2017 | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | US201662412603 | 25.10.2016 | WO2012CA00946 | 12.10.2012 | US201414171288 | 03.02.2014 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | US201462088387 | 05.12.2014 | US201662281890 | 22.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9440114 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2015231449 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012CA00946 | 12.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9737762 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2017 | B2 | US2014206247 | 24.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | US201213639446 | 04.10.2012 | US201414171288 | 03.02.2014 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8641464 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2014 | B2 | US2013059492 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | US201113639446 | 07.04.2011 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10675508 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2020 | B2 | US2018133555 | 17.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213639446 | 04.10.2012 | US201715666206 | 01.08.2017 | US201514435084 | 10.04.2015 | WO2015CA51278 | 04.12.2015 | WO2017CA50044 | 13.01.2017 | US201715789747 | 20.10.2017 | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | US201662412603 | 25.10.2016 | WO2012CA00946 | 12.10.2012 | US201414171288 | 03.02.2014 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | US201462088387 | 05.12.2014 | US201662281890 | 22.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10112079 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2018 | B2 | US2018015330 | 18.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | US201213639446 | 04.10.2012 | US201715666206 | 01.08.2017 | US201414171288 | 03.02.2014 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3697507 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2021 | A4 | EP3697507 | 26.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715789747 | 20.10.2017 | WO2018CA51330 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2555834 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | A4 | EP2555834 | 13.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111629793B | Global Dossier | 22.10.2021 | B | CN111629793 | 04.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201715789747 | 20.10.2017 | WO2018CA51330 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3093359 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715789747 | 20.10.2017 | WO2018CA51330 | 19.10.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3047569 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | C | CA3047569 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | CA2796127 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3007239 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2023 | C | CA3007239 | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462088387 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015CA51278 | 04.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2796127 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2019 | C | CA2796127 | 13.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011238388B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | B2 | AU2011238388 | 08.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32210410 | 08.04.2010 | WO2011CA00395 | 07.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3226984 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2020 | B1 | EP3226984 | 22.08.2018 | A4 | EP3226984 | 11.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462088387 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015CA51278 | 04.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2804464T | 08.02.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201462088387 | 05.12.2014 | WO2015CA51278 | 04.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016086319 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462088387 | 05.12.2014 |