EP3228921 - VEHICLE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ichikoh Industries, Ltd. 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa-ken 259-1192 / JP | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Yutaro c/o ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD. Isehara Plant 80 Itado Isehara-shi Kanagawa 259-1192 / JP | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15865572.0 | 07.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015JP84296 | Priority number, date | JP20140247394 | 05.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014247394 | [2017/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016088900 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228921 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/31, F21S43/40, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/32, F21V8/00, F21S43/14, F21S43/27, F21S43/237, F21S43/241, F21S43/245, F21S43/249, F21S43/145, // F21Y115/10, F21W103/10, F21W103/15 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0035 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0052 (EP,US);
B60Q1/28 (EP,US);
B60Q1/32 (EP,US);
F21S43/145 (EP);
F21S43/237 (EP,US);
F21S43/239 (US);
F21S43/241 (EP,US);
F21S43/245 (EP,US);
F21S43/249 (EP,US);
F21S43/27 (EP,US);
F21S43/31 (EP,US);
F21S43/40 (EP,US);
G02B6/001 (EP,US);
F21W2103/10 (EP,US);
F21W2103/15 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G02B6/0038 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/29] | F21Y115/10, B60Q1/00, B60Q1/28, B60Q1/32, F21V8/00, F21S43/14, F21S43/27, F21S43/237, F21S43/241, F21S43/245, F21S43/249 | ||
Former IPC [2017/41] | F21S8/10, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLAMPE | [2017/41] | English: | VEHICLE LAMP | [2017/41] | French: | LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | Translation filed | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/17] | 15.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006015156 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102008001066 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP2020610 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0024] - [0028]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2012051077 (ARAI HAJIME [JP]) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0011] , [0041] - [0060] - [0073] - [0094]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]FR2970319 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * pages 4-9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2012190762 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * see attached machine translation;; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP2530503 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0017] - [0035]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]JP2014007098 (TOYOTA MOTOR EAST JAPAN INC, et al) [A] 1-9 * see attached machine translation;; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2014127356 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * see attached machine translation;; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JP2014120409 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0028]; fig. 1 to 4 & CN 103885115 A *; | [A]JP2014127356 (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0072]; fig. 1 to 4 & WO 2014/103743 A1 *; | [A]JP2014175091 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-9 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0039]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * |