EP3226688 - TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF MUTANT IDH ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/41] | NOVEL TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF MUTANT IDH ENZYMES | ||
[2020/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISCHER, Christian 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 02 /
BOGEN, Stephane, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
CHILDERS, Matthew, L. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 04 /
LLINAS, Francesc Xavier Fradera 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 05 /
ELLIS, J. Michael 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 06 /
ESPOSITE, Sara 211 Sea Sprite Lane Neptune, New Jersey 07753 / US | 07 /
HONG, Qingmei 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 08 /
HUANG, Chunhui 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 09 /
KIM, Alexander, J. 349 Yorkshire Place Morganville, New Jersey 07751 / US | 10 /
LAMPE, John, W. 409 Widdington Lane Cary, North Carolina 27519-5900 / US | 11 /
MACHACEK, Michelle, R. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 12 /
MCMASTERS, Daniel, R. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 13 /
OTTE, Ryan, D. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 14 /
PARKER, Dann, L., Jr. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 15 /
REUTERSHAN, Michael 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 16 /
SCIAMMETTA, Nunzio 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 17 /
SHAO, Pengcheng, P. 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 18 /
SLOMAN, David, L. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 19 /
UJJAINWALLA, Feroze 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 20 /
WHITE, Catherine 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 21 /
WU, Zhicai 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Böhles, Elena Merck Sharp & Dohme (UK) Limited 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Böhles, Elena Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15865691.8 | 01.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015US63061 | Priority number, date | US201462088262P | 05.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462088262 P | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016089797 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3226688 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3226688 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/00, A61K31/551, C07D471/14 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
C07D498/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/41] | A01N43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN VON MUTANTEN IDH-ENZYMEN | [2020/08] | English: | TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF MUTANT IDH ENZYMES | [2020/08] | French: | COMPOSÉS TRICYCLIQUES SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS D'ENZYMES IDH MUTANTES | [2020/08] |
Former [2017/41] | NEUARTIGE TRICYCLISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN VON MUTANTEN IDH-ENZYMEN | ||
Former [2017/41] | NOVEL TRICYCLIC COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF MUTANT IDH ENZYMES | ||
Former [2017/41] | COMPOSÉS TRICYCLIQUES INNOVANTS SERVANT D'INHIBITEURS D'ENZYMES IDH MUTANTES | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 05.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2015 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | IE | 01.12.2020 | LU | 01.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 01.12.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
IE | 01.12.2020 | ||
LU | 01.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03000692 (FERRING BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 60, line 22 - line 25; example 83; claims 1,24 *; | [A]WO2009063993 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * example 40; table 1 *; | [A]US2009227565 (FAILLI AMEDEO A [US], et al)[A] 1-18 | International search | [A]WO0043398 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-3, 19-20* ; entire document *; | [A]US6235900 (FAILLI AMEDEO A [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 19-20 * ; entire document *; | [A]US6620807 (STEFFAN ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 19-20 * ; col 4, In 34-35 *; | [A]US7022699 (FAILLI AMEDEO ARTURO [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 19-20 * ; entire document *; | [X]US2009227565 (FAILLI AMEDEO A [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 19-20 * ; para [0115] * | by applicant | WO0102369 | WO0210192 | WO02068470 | WO03000692 | WO2004004771 | WO2004056875 | WO2004072286 | US7488802 | US7521051 | WO2009063993 | WO2010027827 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066342 | US8008449 | US2011271358 | US8168757 | US8354509 | WO2013019906 | US8383796 | - L. DANG et al., Trends Mol. Med., (20100000), vol. 16, page 387 | - T. SHIBATA et al., Am. J. Pathol., (20110000), vol. 178, no. 3, page 1395 | - GAAL et al., J. Clin. Endocrinol. Metab., (20100000), vol. 95, no. 3, page 1274 | - BALSS et al., Acta Neuropathol., (20080000), vol. 116, page 597 |