EP3229060 - EYEGLASS LENS AND EYEGLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOYA LENS THAILAND LTD. 853 Phaholyothin Road Prachatipat Thanyaburi Pathumthani 12130 / TH | [2023/33] |
Former [2017/41] | For all designated states Hoya Lens Thailand Ltd. 853 Phaholyothin Rd. Prachatipat 12130 Thanyaburi Patumthani / TH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGO, Yoichi c/o HOYA CORPORATION 6-10-1 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8647 / JP | 02 /
NISHIMOTO, Keiji c/o HOYA CORPORATION 6-10-1 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8647 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Naomi c/o HOYA CORPORATION 6-10-1 Nishi-Shinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8647 / JP | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/41] | 01 /
OGO Yoichi c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | ||
02 /
NISHIMOTO Keiji c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | |||
03 /
OGAWA Naomi c/o HOYA CORPORATION 7-5 Naka-Ochiai 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 161-8525 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15865958.1 | 01.12.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015JP83783 | Priority number, date | JP20140243559 | 01.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014243559 | [2017/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016088763 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229060 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3229060 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/10, G02B1/115, G02B5/26, G02B5/28 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G02C7/104 (EP,US);
G02C7/10 (KR,US);
G02B1/115 (KR,US);
G02B1/116 (EP);
G02B5/26 (KR,US);
G02B5/28 (KR,US);
G02C7/107 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRILLENGLAS UND BRILLE | [2017/41] | English: | EYEGLASS LENS AND EYEGLASSES | [2017/41] | French: | VERRE DE LUNETTES ET LUNETTES | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2017 | Translation filed | 21.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | LU | 01.12.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
IT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SI | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2013008052 (NIKON ESSILOR CO LTD) [Y] 2,4* paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]JP2013097160 (HOYA CORP) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0021] *; | [XY]WO2013171435 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1,5-13 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4; | [XY]WO2014057226 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1,3,5-13 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4; | [XPY]US2015261010 (KUDLA AMELIE [FR], et al) [XP] 1,5-13 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4; | [Y] - CITEK ET AL, "Anti-reflective coatings reflect ultraviolet radiation", OPTOMETRY - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OPTOMETRIC ASSOCIATION, ELSEVIER, NL, (20080224), vol. 79, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.OPTM.2007.08.019, ISSN 1529-1839, pages 143 - 148, XP022496911 [Y] 1-4 * page 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.optm.2007.08.019 | International search | [A]US6793339 (YIP BRANDON [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document & WO 1999/021048 A1 & EP 1004049 A & AU P0995097 D & AU PP899799 D & AU 9728998 A & BR 9809060 A & CA 2285612 A *; | [A]WO2013122253 (NIKON ESSILOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* , entire text; all drawings & JP 2014-240997 A & US 2014/0347625 A1 & EP 2816379 A1 & CN 104115037 A *; | [X]WO2013171435 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1-13 * , page 14, lines 27 to 35; page 15, lines 8 to 12; page 17, line 13 to page 18, line 5; page 18, line 34 to page 19, line 3; page 21, lines 4 to 13; fig. 1 to 3; examples 1 to 3 & JP 2015-520413 A & JP 2015-520412 A & US 2015/0098058 A1 & US 2015/0234208 A1 & US 2015/0103310 A1 & EP 2850485 A & EP 2 *; | [XA]WO2014057226 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [X] 1, 3-13 * , page 15, lines 21 to 25; page 23, line 27 to page 24, line 8; fig. 1, 2; examples 1 to 3 & JP 2015-531497 A & US 2015/0261010 A1 & EP 2906990 A & FR 2996930 A & CA 2887981 A & AU 2013328478 A & CN 104704420 A * [A] 2; | [PA]WO2014208412 (NIKON ESSILOR CO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-13 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 2015-7695 A *; | [PX]JP2015045743 (TOKAI KOGAKU KK) [PX] 1-13 * , examples 31 to 55; fig. 1 to 12 & WO 2015/029644 A1 * |