EP3228730 - ETCHING AGENT AND REPLENISHING SOLUTION THEREFOR, METHOD FOR ROUGHENING SURFACE OF MAGNESIUM COMPONENT, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MAGNESIUM-RESIN COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEC COMPANY LTD. 3-4-1, Kuise Minamishimmachi Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0822 / JP | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIYAMA, Daisaku c/o MEC COMPANY LTD. 3-4-1, Kuise Minamishimmachi Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0822 / JP | 02 /
RAIJO, Mina c/o MEC COMPANY LTD. 3-4-1, Kuise Minamishimmachi Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0822 / JP | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2017/41] | Application number, filing date | 15866351.8 | 17.09.2015 | [2017/41] | WO2015JP76483 | Priority number, date | JP20140242948 | 01.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014242948 | [2017/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016088432 | Date: | 09.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3228730 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/22, B29C45/02, B29C45/14 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
C23F1/22 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/02 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/14311 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14868 (KR);
B29K2705/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] | Title | German: | ÄTZMITTEL UND NACHFÜLLLÖSUNG DAFÜR, VERFAHREN ZUM AUFRAUEN DER OBERFLÄCHE EINER MAGNESIUMKOMPONENTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MAGNESIUM-HARZ-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2017/41] | English: | ETCHING AGENT AND REPLENISHING SOLUTION THEREFOR, METHOD FOR ROUGHENING SURFACE OF MAGNESIUM COMPONENT, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MAGNESIUM-RESIN COMPOSITE | [2017/41] | French: | AGENT DE GRAVURE ET SOLUTION DE RÉAPPROVISIONNEMENT ASSOCIÉE, PROCÉDÉ DE RUGOSIFICATION DE SURFACE DE CONSITUANT EN MAGNÉSIUM ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSITE RÉSINE-MAGNÉSIUM | [2017/41] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2017 | Translation filed | 14.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 14.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1065016 (BORG HOLDING A G) [X] 1,2 * example 2 * [I] 4; | [XI]US2003013306 (TSAI STAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 8 * [I] 4; | [A]EP1944389 (TAISEI PLAS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0032]; claim - *; | [A]KR20130037378 (IL KWANG POLYMER CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH11315381 (SHIPLEY CO LLC) [A] 1-9 * , & US 6054061 A & US 6261466 B1 *; | [A]JP2012028393 (TOSOH CORP) [A] 1-9 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013234385 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-9* , & US 2014/0014615 A1 & CN 103361644 A * |