EP3231428 - PHARMACOTHERAPY FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING GLAUCOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Yoshio c/o KOWA COMPANY, LTD. Tokyo New Drug Research Laboratories 2-17-43 Noguchi-cho Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189-0022 / JP | 02 /
OHTA, Masayuki c/o KOWA COMPANY, LTD. Tokyo New Drug Research Laboratories 2-17-43 Noguchi-cho Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189-0022 / JP | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15866838.4 | 11.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015JP84817 | Priority number, date | JP20140252052 | 12.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014252052 | [2017/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016093348 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231428 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3231428 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/551, A61K31/498, A61K45/00, A61K47/22, A61P27/06, A61P43/00 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/498 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61P27/06 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/498, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/551, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELTHERAPIE ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON GLAUKOMEN | [2017/42] | English: | PHARMACOTHERAPY FOR PREVENTING OR TREATING GLAUCOMA | [2017/42] | French: | PHARMACOTHÉRAPIE POUR LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DU GLAUCOME | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2017 | Translation filed | 02.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 02.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2015 | AL | 04.03.2020 | AT | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | CZ | 04.03.2020 | DK | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | ES | 04.03.2020 | FI | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | IT | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | NL | 04.03.2020 | PL | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SE | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | TR | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | NO | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | PT | 29.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.12.2015 | |
AT | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
TR | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 04.03.2020 | |
CZ | 04.03.2020 | ||
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
IT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
PL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
DK | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 04.03.2020 | |
ES | 04.03.2020 | ||
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
PT | 29.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | ES | 04.03.2020 | |
FI | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
NL | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SE | 04.03.2020 | ||
NO | 04.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 04.03.2020 | |
NO | 04.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1818059 (KOWA CO [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph [0001] * * page 3, paragraph [0023] * * page 5, paragraph [0045] * * page 6, paragraph [0050] * * claims 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2011178145 (DONELLO JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 1, paragraphs [0002]-[0006] *; | [E]EP3231429 (KOWA CO [JP]) [E] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph [0007] ** claims 1-4, 7 *; | [XDI] - TADASHIRO SAEKI ET AL, "Mouse Gan'atsu ni Taisuru ROCK Sogaizai K115 to Brimonidine no Heiyo Koka [Effect of combination of ROCK inhibitor K 15 and brimonidine on mouse intraocular pressure]", JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR OCULAR PHARMACOLOGY PROGRAM.KEEN SHOROKUSHU, JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR OCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, JP, (20070101), vol. 27, page 59, XP009503706 [XD] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document * [I] 9 | [I] - LEE ANNE J ET AL, "Emerging drugs for ocular hypertension", EXPERT OPINION ON EMERGING DRUGS ENG, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, UK, (20110301), vol. 16, no. 1, doi:10.1517/14728214.2011.521631, ISSN 1744-7623, pages 137 - 161, XP008161576 [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 140; table 1 * * page 142, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 148, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 149; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14728214.2011.521631 | International search | [YA]WO2006068208 (KOWA CO [JP], et al) [Y] 3, 7, 9 * , entire text & JP 4099201 B & US 2006/0142270 A1 & EP 1818059 A1 * [A] 1, 2, 4-6, 8, 10-13; | [YA]JP2012250953 (SANTEN PHARMA CO LTD) [Y] 3, 7, 9 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 1, 2, 4-6, 8, 10-13; | [YA]JP2014520895 (Allergan, Inc.) [Y] 3, 7, 9 * , examples & WO 2013/013143 A1 examples & US 2014/0249153 A1 & EP 2734206 A1 * [A] 1, 2, 4-6, 8, 10-13; | [XY] - TADASHIRO SAEKI et al., "Mouse Gan'atsu ni Taisuru ROCK Sogaizai K115 to Brimonidine no Heiyo Koka", Japanese Society for Ocular Pharmacology Program·Keen Shorokushu, (20070000), vol. 27, page 59, XP009503706 [X] 1, 2, 4-6, 8, 10-13 [Y] 3, 7, 9 | [A] - GOMI NORIAKI et al., "A Practical Synthesis of (S)-tert-Butyl-3-Methyl-1,4-diazepane-1- carboxylate, the Key Intermediate of Rho-Kinase Inhibitor K-115", Synthesis, (20120000), vol. 44, no. 20, pages 3171 - 3178, XP 055453983 [A] 1-13 * (A document showing the structure of K115) * |