EP3230610 - ISOLATOR FOR USE WITH ENGINE THAT IS ASSISTED OR STARTED BY AN MGU OR A MOTOR THROUGH AN ENDLESS DRIVE MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 5T7 / CA | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTCHAK, John R. 135 Kennedy St. West Aurora, Ontario L4G 2L8 / CA | 02 /
REPLETE, Boris 253 Lauder Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6E 3H5 / CA | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 15866959.8 | 09.12.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015CA51299 | Priority number, date | US201462089403P | 09.12.2014 Original published format: US 201462089403 P | [2017/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016090488 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3230610 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/14, B60K25/02, F02B67/06, F16D3/10, F16D3/12, F16D3/66, F16H55/36 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
B60K25/02 (US);
F02B67/06 (US);
F16F15/12346 (EP,US);
F16F15/12373 (EP,US);
F16H55/36 (EP,US);
F16H55/49 (US);
F16D3/10 (US);
F16D3/12 (US);
F16D3/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | ISOLATOR ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM MITTELS EINER MGU-UNTERSTÜTZTEN ODER GESTARTETEN MOTORS ODER EINES MOTORS MIT EINEM ENDLOSTRIEBELEMENT | [2017/42] | English: | ISOLATOR FOR USE WITH ENGINE THAT IS ASSISTED OR STARTED BY AN MGU OR A MOTOR THROUGH AN ENDLESS DRIVE MEMBER | [2017/42] | French: | ISOLATEUR À UTILISER AVEC UN MOTEUR QUI EST ASSISTÉ OU DÉMARRÉ PAR UNE UNITÉ MOTEUR/GÉNÉRATEUR OU UN MOTEUR PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN ÉLÉMENT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT SANS FIN | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 09.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/29] | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6394248 (MONAHAN RUSSELL E [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,13 * figure 10 * [Y] 7,8,10,11; | [X]US2007066426 (KAMDEM HENRI [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,13 * figure 7 *; | [X]WO9850709 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [X] 1,4,5,13 * figures 1,13a *; | [Y]DE102008059263 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2014056096 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [Y] 10,11 * figure 5 * | International search | [A]WO2014056097 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2014186876 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2013033825 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2015010187 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2015066800 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE INC [CA]) [A] 1-13 |