EP3231931 - WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haier Asia Co., Ltd 10th Floor Meiji Yasuda Seimei Building 2-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states Qingdao Haier Washing Machine Co., Ltd. No. 1 Haier Road Laoshan District Qingdao Shandong 266101 / CN | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Hiroyuki 10th Floor Meiji Yasuda Seimei Building 2-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 02 /
TAKENAKA, Takuo 10th Floor Meiji Yasuda Seimei Building 2-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Tamotsu 10th Floor Meiji Yasuda Seimei Building 2-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 04 /
MAMIYA, Haruo 10th Floor Meiji Yasuda Seimei Building 2-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 05 /
NISHIURA, Naoto 10th Floor Meiji Yasuda Seimei Building 2-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15867159.4 | 26.11.2015 | [2017/42] | WO2015CN95670 | Priority number, date | JP20140249099 | 09.12.2014 Original published format: JP 2014249099 | [2017/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016091081 | Date: | 16.06.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231931 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.06.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08, // D06F37/26, D06F37/12, D06F37/30 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
D06F39/083 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/28 (KR);
D06F37/12 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/267 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/28 (KR);
D06F37/304 (EP,KR,US);
D06F37/36 (KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | D06F39/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE | [2017/42] | English: | WASHING MACHINE | [2017/42] | French: | MACHINE À LAVER | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2017 | Translation filed | 20.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 20.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010000266 (CHUNG SEUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-10 * [A] 5,7 [I] 6; | [XAI]KR100539506B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 7 [I] 6; | [XA]US2012096652 (CHOI YUN HO [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-6 * [A] 5,7; | [XAI]KR100685981B (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 7 [I] 6 | International search | [X]CN203683954U (HISENSE RONSHEN GUANGDONG REFRIGERATORS CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * description, paragraphs [0007]-[0017], and figure 1 *; | [A]CN1093764 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2002263396 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |